Cowden et al v. KDL Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Cowden and Kristie Cowden
Defendant: KDL Solutions LLC and Bruni SRL
Case Number: 5:2020cv00830
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Withdraw. Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Against Bruni SRL Doc. No. #18 is withdrawn and stricken. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 10/13/2020. (nv)
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw #18 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Bruni SRL by All Plaintiffs. (Lujan, Harrison)
October 8, 2020 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Anna Kathleen Rush on behalf of KDL Solutions LLC (Rush, Anna)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anna K. Rush, provided counsel, as instructed by LCvR83.2(g), submits an ECF registration form and, upon activation, electronically files an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4. Counsel must follow the local rules of this Court, including but not limited to immediate disclosures to the Court of any suspension, disbarment, or resignation that triggers the application of LCvR83.6(a). Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 10/02/2020. (nv)
October 2, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3312349 by KDL Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission PHV of Anna Rush)(Bowman, Andrew)
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 STRICKEN MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Bruni SRL by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons KDL Solutions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons Bruni SRL, #3 Exhibit 3 - Return of Service)(Lujan, Harrison) Modified on 10/13/2020 striking document. See #23 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw (nv).
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom 502 before Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Status Report due by 10/19/2020. (em)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - filed Return of Service)(Lujan, Harrison)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 E-MAIL of Acknowledgment of receipt of this Court's E-mail Doc. No. #11 from Kindanne Jones, Deputy Attorney General - Office of the Attorney General. E-mail received on 08/24/2020 at 4:44 p.m. (nv)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Simone Gosnell Fulmer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fulmer, Simone)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Harrison C Lujan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lujan, Harrison)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY GENERAL from Courtroom Deputy Nyssa Vasquez. (nv)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION re #10 Notice (other) filed by KDL Solutions LLC. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(c), the Attorney General may intervene within 60 days after the filing of Defendants Notice, or by October 23, 2020. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Certification and [Doc. Nos. 10 and 10-1] to the Oklahoma Attorney General either by certified or registered mail or by transmission to an electronic address designated by the Oklahoma Attorney General for this purpose. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/24/2020. (nv)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE (other) by KDL Solutions LLC of Constitutional Question (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer of KDL Solutions, LLC)(Bowman, Andrew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by KDL Solutions LLC.(Bowman, Andrew)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by KDL Solutions LLC . (Bowman, Andrew)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. A review of the filings in this case reveals that the Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant KDL Solutions, LLC Doc. No. #4 is not compliant with LCvR7.1.1. Local Civil Rule 7.1.1. Accordingly, Doc. No. #4 is STRICKEN and Defendant is ORDERED to refile a disclosure statement that conforms with LCvR7.1.1 and the information provided in the Notice of Removal [Doc. No. 1 Par. 17] within seven days, or by August 28, 2020. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 08/21/2020. (nv)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J Blaschke on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blaschke, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel L Mor on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mor, Rachel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by KDL Solutions LLC . (Bowman, Andrew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew M Bowman on behalf of KDL Solutions LLC (Bowman, Andrew)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry D Ottaway on behalf of KDL Solutions LLC (Ottaway, Larry)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Lincoln County, case number CJ-2019-168 filed by KDL Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5 - Schrader v. Farmers, #6 Exhibit 6 - Reed Judgment, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)
August 18, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3231980. (Bowman, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowden et al v. KDL Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KDL Solutions LLC
Represented By: Andrew M Bowman
Represented By: Larry D Ottaway
Represented By: Anna Kathleen Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruni SRL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Cowden
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Represented By: Rachel L Mor
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Represented By: Simone Gosnell Fulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Cowden
Represented By: Michael J Blaschke
Represented By: Rachel L Mor
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Represented By: Simone Gosnell Fulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?