Winston v. Zaan et al
Plaintiff: Carol Winston
Defendant: Swift Transporation Co of Arizona LLC, Zachary Zaan and Swift Leasing Co LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00836
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Zachary Zaan. (Hancock, Nicholaus)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Swift Transporation Co of Arizona LLC. (Hancock, Nicholaus)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (McIntyre, Noble)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (McIntyre, Noble)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy A Thurman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Thurman, Jeremy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Noble K McIntyre on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McIntyre, Noble)
August 27, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3249107. (Coffey, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Zachary Zaan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(Coffey, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Swift Transporation Co of Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(Coffey, Robert)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Swift Leasing Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(Coffey, Robert)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Swift Leasing Co LLC, Swift Transporation Co of Arizona LLC. (Coffey, Robert)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Swift Transporation Co of Arizona LLC . (Coffey, Robert)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Swift Leasing Co LLC . (Coffey, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholaus A Hancock on behalf of Swift Leasing Co LLC, Swift Transporation Co of Arizona LLC, Zachary Zaan (Hancock, Nicholaus)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert P Coffey, Jr on behalf of Swift Leasing Co LLC, Swift Transporation Co of Arizona LLC, Zachary Zaan (Coffey, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-3409 filed by Swift Leasing Co LLC, Swift Transporation Co of Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Service of Process Transmittal Form, #4 Exhibit 4 - Service of Process Transmittal Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winston v. Zaan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transporation Co of Arizona LLC
Represented By: Nicholaus A Hancock
Represented By: Robert P Coffey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Zaan
Represented By: Nicholaus A Hancock
Represented By: Robert P Coffey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Leasing Co LLC
Represented By: Nicholaus A Hancock
Represented By: Robert P Coffey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Winston
Represented By: Noble K McIntyre
Represented By: Jordan L Klingler
Represented By: Jeremy A Thurman
Represented By: Monica M Kuykendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?