Kim et al v. Chubb Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Donald Kim and Kyungia Cho
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company and Vigilant Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00837
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 10/22/2020. (md)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph J Reinke on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reinke, Joseph)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by All Defendants.(Stiner, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Defendants . (Stiner, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by John D Stiner on behalf of All Defendants (Stiner, John)
August 19, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3234204. (Stiner, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-3240 filed by Vigilant Insurance Company, Chubb Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Petition, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim et al v. Chubb Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Kim
Represented By: Joseph J Reinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyungia Cho
Represented By: Joseph J Reinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Insurance Company
Represented By: John D Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigilant Insurance Company
Represented By: John D Stiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?