Jones v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Jones
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Case Number: 5:2020cv00838
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Debra Ann Jones. (Garrett, Bryan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan G Garrett on behalf of Debra Ann Jones (Garrett, Bryan)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 OCTOBER STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2020 10:10 AM in Chambers before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 9/29/2020. (ks)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court)(Brewer, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Scott, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP . (Brewer, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Brewer, Michael)
August 21, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3238026. (Brewer, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-2022 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- Petition, #4 Exhibit 4- Answer to Plaintiff's Petition, #5 Exhibit 5- Entry of Appearance, #6 Exhibit 6- Entry of Appearance, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Ann Jones
Represented By: Bryan G Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?