Cobb v. Tinker Federal Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: Galan D Cobb
Defendant: Hall and Ludlam PLLC, Joel C Hall, Randy G Gordon, Mulinix Ogden Hall Andrews and Ludlam PLLC, Jeffrey S Ludlam and Tinker Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 5:2020cv00847
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tinker Federal Credit Union. (Clifton, Hilary)
October 9, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim filed by Randy G Gordon, Joel C Hall, Hall and Ludlam PLLC, Jeffrey S Ludlam, Mulinix Ogden Hall Andrews and Ludlam PLLC. (Donchin, David)
October 3, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Appellee Answer Brief, #4 Exhibit COA Opinion, #5 Exhibit Appeal Docket, #6 Exhibit Brief and Chief, #7 Exhibit Reply Brief, #8 Exhibit App HOA's, #9 Exhibit Renewal of Judgments, #10 Exhibit Nunc Pro Tunc Order)(Donahoe, Laurence)
October 2, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Appellee Answer Brief, #4 Exhibit COA Opinion, #5 Exhibit Appeal Docket, #6 Exhibit Brief and Chief, #7 Exhibit Reply Brief, #8 Exhibit App HOA's, #9 Exhibit Renewal of Judgments, #10 Exhibit Nunc Pro Tunc Order)(Donahoe, Laurence)
September 18, 2020 Docket Annotation: Doc. #13 is STRICKEN. Document was filed incorrectly. (dwl)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Galan D Cobb. Hall and Ludlam PLLC served on 8/26/2020. (Donahoe, Laurence)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Galan D Cobb. Tinker Federal Credit Union served on 8/26/2020. (Donahoe, Laurence)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Galan D Cobb. Mulinix Ogden Hall Andrews and Ludlam PLLC served on 8/26/2020. (Donahoe, Laurence)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Galan D Cobb. Jeffrey S Ludlam served on 8/26/2020. (Donahoe, Laurence)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Galan D Cobb. Joel C Hall served on 8/26/2020. (Donahoe, Laurence)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 SUBPOENA Returned Executed by Galan D Cobb as to Hall and Ludlam PLLC. (Donahoe, Laurence) *STRICKEN (dwl).
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Galan D Cobb. Randy G Gordon served on 9/2/2020. (Donahoe, Laurence)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Hall and Ludlam PLLC . (Donchin, David)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Mulinix Ogden Hall Andrews and Ludlam PLLC . (Donchin, David)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Tinker Federal Credit Union . (Clifton, Hilary)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Tinker Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collection Case Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Collection Case Petition, #3 Exhibit Collection Case Motion to Quash, #4 Exhibit OCPA Orders, #5 Exhibit NCUA Letter)(Clifton, Hilary)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Lyndon W Whitmire on behalf of Tinker Federal Credit Union (Whitmire, Lyndon)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Hilary H Clifton on behalf of Tinker Federal Credit Union (Clifton, Hilary)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim by Randy G Gordon, Joel C Hall, Hall and Ludlam PLLC, Jeffrey S Ludlam, Mulinix Ogden Hall Andrews and Ludlam PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Collection Case Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 H&L SOS Printout, #3 Exhibit 3 OBA Member Search Gordon, #4 Exhibit 4 2016 HOA App Order, #5 Exhibit 5 OCPA Orders, #6 Exhibit 6 NCUA CFPB)(Donchin, David)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer K Christian on behalf of Randy G Gordon, Joel C Hall, Hall and Ludlam PLLC, Jeffrey S Ludlam, Mulinix Ogden Hall Andrews and Ludlam PLLC (Christian, Jennifer)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by David B Donchin on behalf of Randy G Gordon, Joel C Hall, Hall and Ludlam PLLC, Jeffrey S Ludlam, Mulinix Ogden Hall Andrews and Ludlam PLLC (Donchin, David)
August 24, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3242108. (Donahoe, Laurence)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Randy G Gordon, Joel C Hall, Hall and Ludlam PLLC, Jeffrey S Ludlam, Mulinix Ogden Hall Andrews and Ludlam PLLC, Tinker Federal Credit Union. (knt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Randy G Gordon, Joel C Hall, Hall and Ludlam PLLC, Jeffrey S Ludlam, Mulinix Ogden Hall Andrews and Ludlam PLLC, Tinker Federal Credit Union filed by Galan D Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. Tinker Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall and Ludlam PLLC
Represented By: David B Donchin
Represented By: Jennifer K Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel C Hall
Represented By: David B Donchin
Represented By: Jennifer K Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy G Gordon
Represented By: David B Donchin
Represented By: Jennifer K Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulinix Ogden Hall Andrews and Ludlam PLLC
Represented By: David B Donchin
Represented By: Jennifer K Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S Ludlam
Represented By: David B Donchin
Represented By: Jennifer K Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tinker Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Hilary H Clifton
Represented By: Lyndon W Whitmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galan D Cobb
Represented By: Laurence K Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?