Harmon County Board of County Commissioners v. Cephalon Inc et al
Plaintiff: Harmon County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, SPECGX LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00850
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Harmon County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 130, #2 Exhibit 2 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 232)(Court, Todd)
October 14, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Expedite Treatment of the Motion to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 14, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 13, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
October 12, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, SPECGX LLC (Epstein, Jon)
October 12, 2020 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX LLC . (Epstein, Jon)
October 12, 2020 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon Epstein on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, SPECGX LLC (Epstein, Jon)
September 30, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ada Stay Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seminole Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Osage Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pawnee Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Stay Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Granting Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - CTO 164, #8 Exhibit 8 - Wis Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - Cal Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - JPML Dkt 5422, #16 Exhibit 16 - JPML Dkt 5737, #17 Exhibit 17 - JPML Dkt 6100, #18 Exhibit 18 - JPML Dkt 6538, #19 Exhibit 19 - Transfer Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - JPML 7403, #21 Exhibit 21 - JPML 7543, #22 Exhibit 22 - JPML 7573, #23 Exhibit 23 - JPML 7713, #24 Exhibit 24 - Alameda CA Stay Order, #25 Exhibit 25 - City of Portland v. Purdue, #26 Exhibit 26 - EDVA Stay Order, #27 Exhibit 27 - WDVA Stay Order, #28 Exhibit 28 - Cal Stay Order 2, #29 Exhibit 29 - Ill Stay Order 1, #30 Exhibit 30 - Fla Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
September 30, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Expedite filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
September 23, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Expedite by Harmon County Board of County Commissioners. (Court, Todd)
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand by Harmon County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/8/2020. (mb)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/2/20. (kmt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,, by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summonses, #4 Exhibit 4 - Appearance (Cardinal), #5 Exhibit 5 - Appearance (McKesson), #6 Exhibit 6 - Motion for Extension (McKesson), #7 Exhibit 7 - Appearance (ABDC), #8 Exhibit 8 - Order Granting Extension (McKesson), #9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Removal (Part 1), #11 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Removal (Part 2), #12 Exhibit 11 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,, (Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings) by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Huntsman, Susan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 25, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3243194. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Harmon County, case number CJ-2020-05 filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01 Service Documents, #2 Exhibit 02 State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 03 Petition, #4 Exhibit 04 Summons to Actavis LLC, #5 Exhibit 05 Summons to Actavis Pharma Inc, #6 Exhibit 06 Summons to Actavis PLC, #7 Exhibit 07 Summons to Allergan PLC, #8 Exhibit 08 Summons to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #9 Exhibit 09 Summons to Cardinal Health Inc, #10 Exhibit 10 Summons to Cephalon Inc, #11 Exhibit 11 Summons to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #12 Exhibit 12 Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #13 Exhibit 13 Summons to GCP Pharma LLC, #14 Exhibit 14 Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #15 Exhibit 15 Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #16 Exhibit 16 Summons to Johnson and Johnson, #17 Exhibit 17 Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC, #18 Exhibit 18 Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, #19 Exhibit 19 Summons to McKesson Corporation, #20 Exhibit 20 Summons to Morris & Dickson Co LLC, #21 Exhibit 21 Summons to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc, #22 Exhibit 22 Summons to Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #23 Exhibit 23 Summons to Par Pharmaceutical Inc, #24 Exhibit 24 Summons to SpecGx LLC, #25 Exhibit 25 Summons to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, #26 Exhibit 26 Summons to Watson Laboratories Inc, #27 Exhibit 27 Summons to Watson Pharma Inc, #28 Exhibit 28 Summons to Watson Pharmaceeuticals Inc, #29 Exhibit 29 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Cardinal Health Inc, #30 Exhibit 30 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer filed by McKesson et al, #31 Exhibit 31 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for McKesson Corporation, #32 Exhibit 32 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #33 Exhibit 33 Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer, #34 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon County Board of County Commissioners v. Cephalon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Robert H Alexander, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harmon County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: J Mart Tisdal
Represented By: Patrick O'Hara, Jr
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Represented By: Todd A Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?