Haygood v. JWC Environmental Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Haygood
Defendant: JWC Environmental Inc, John and Jane Does 1-100 and John Doe
Case Number: 5:2020cv00863
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Jacob Haygood. (Zelbst, John)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Unless the Court directs otherwise, the case Scheduling Order will be issued basedon the parties Joint Status Report. Should the Court decide that a scheduling conferenceis necessary, the conference will be conducted telephonically, pursuant to the CourtsChambers Rules located on the Courts website. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/13/2020. (mb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2020 03:00 PM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 10/23/2020. (mb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by JWC Environmental Inc . (Vincent, Evan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by JWC Environmental Inc.(Vincent, Evan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan G E Vincent on behalf of JWC Environmental Inc (Vincent, Evan)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Haygood. All Plaintiffs. (Zelbst, John)
August 27, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3247973. (Zelbst, John)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to JWC Environmental Inc. (kmt)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, John Doe, John and Jane Does 1-100, JWC Environmental Inc filed by Jacob Haygood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haygood v. JWC Environmental Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWC Environmental Inc
Represented By: Evan G E Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Haygood
Represented By: David L Butler
Represented By: John P Zelbst
Represented By: Chandra L Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?