Hawkins v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Plaintiff: Grady Hawkins
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00882
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason B Reynolds on behalf of Grady Hawkins (Reynolds, Jason)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2020 09:45 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 11/2/2020. (llg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lowe's Home Centers LLC.(Schrag, Jeremy)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew M Gunn on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Gunn, Andrew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Lowe's Home Centers LLC . (Schrag, Jeremy)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Schrag, Jeremy)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy K Schrag on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Schrag, Jeremy)
September 1, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3255681. (Schrag, Jeremy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-867 filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Jeremy K Schrag
Represented By: Andrew M Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grady Hawkins
Represented By: Jason B Reynolds
Represented By: Justin W Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?