Plainsmen Energy Inc v. SK Nemaha LLC
Plaintiff: Plainsmen Energy Inc
Defendant: SK Nemaha LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00895
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Robin J Cauthron
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Plainsmen Energy Inc. (Puls, William)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2020 @10:10 AM in Chambers before Honorable Robin J. Cauthron. (wh)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plainsmen Energy Inc. (Puls, William)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Plainsmen Energy Inc . (Puls, William)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by William Kelly Puls on behalf of Plainsmen Energy Inc (Puls, William)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by SK Nemaha LLC.(Lewis, Kerry)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by SK Nemaha LLC . (Lewis, Kerry)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott L. Palk no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 9/8/2020. (md)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Lindsey E Albers on behalf of SK Nemaha LLC (Albers, Lindsey)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Kerry R Lewis on behalf of SK Nemaha LLC (Lewis, Kerry)
September 4, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3264465. (Lewis, Kerry)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Garfield County, case number CJ-2020-183-02 filed by SK Nemaha LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Petition, #2 Exhibit 2- Summons, #3 Exhibit 3- EOA, #4 Exhibit 4- EOA, #5 Exhibit 5- Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6- Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plainsmen Energy Inc v. SK Nemaha LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plainsmen Energy Inc
Represented By: William Kelly Puls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SK Nemaha LLC
Represented By: Lindsey E Albers
Represented By: Kerry R Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?