Whyte Monkee Productions LLC et al v. Netflix INC
Plaintiff: Whyte Monkee Productions LLC and Timothy Sepi
Defendant: Netflix INC and Royal Goode Productions LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00933
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 37 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/13/2021. (mb)
May 5, 2021 Filing 36 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order Second Joint Motion for Protective Order + Exhibit 1: Second Agreed Protective Order by Netflix INC, Royal Goode Productions LLC. (Rotstein, Robert)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #33 Joint Motion for Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/14/2021. (mb)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 14 days; Motions to amend due 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 2/4/2022; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 2/18/2022; Pla witness list due 2/18/2022; Pla exhibit list due 2/18/2022; Stipulations due 5/4/2022; Motions in limine due 5/4/2022; Jury instructions due 5/4/2022; Voir dire requests due 5/4/2022; Discovery due by 4/4/2022. Jury Trial set for 6/14/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Motions due by 3/4/2022. Pretrial Report due by 5/4/2022.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/14/2021. (mb)
April 7, 2021 Filing 33 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Netflix INC, Royal Goode Productions LLC. (Rotstein, Robert)
April 5, 2021 Filing 32 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Timothy Sepi, Whyte Monkee Productions LLC. (Free, Phillip)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: Unless the Court directs otherwise, the case Scheduling Order will be issued based on the parties Joint Status Report. Should the Court decide that a scheduling conference is necessary, the conference will be conducted telephonically, pursuant to the Courts Chambers Rules located on the Courts website. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/24/2021. (knt)
March 5, 2021 Filing 30 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 301 before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 4/5/2021. (mb)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #18 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/1/2021. (mb)
January 13, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY by Defendants Netflix INC, Royal Goode Productions LLC re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Netflix INC, Royal Goode Productions LLC. (Rotstein, Robert)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case Reply due by 1/13/2021.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/4/2021. (mb)
January 4, 2021 Filing 26 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Transfer Case by Netflix INC, Royal Goode Productions LLC. (Morgan, Mack)
December 30, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy Sepi, #2 Exhibit Netflix corporate information, #3 Exhibit Chart of Median Time Intervals for District Courts, #4 Exhibit Copyright Assignment)(Free, Phillip)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case Response due by 12/30/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/21/2020. (mb)
December 18, 2020 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Whyte Monkee Productions LLC . (Free, Phillip)
December 18, 2020 Filing 22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Transfer Case by All Plaintiffs. (Free, Phillip)
December 18, 2020 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Whyte Monkee Productions LLC . (Free, Phillip)
December 18, 2020 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Phillip L Free, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Free, Phillip)
December 1, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Netflix INC, Royal Goode Productions LLC.(Rotstein, Robert)
December 1, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Case by Netflix INC, Royal Goode Productions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca Chaiklin in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 1 to Chaiklin Declaration, #3 Declaration of Wade Gentz in Support of Motion to Transfer, #4 Declaration of Emily F. Evitt in Support of Motion to Transfer, #5 Exhibit 1 to Evitt Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 to Evitt Declaration, #7 Exhibit 3 to Evitt Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4 to Evitt Declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 to Evitt Declaration, #10 Exhibit 6 to Evitt Declaration)(Rotstein, Robert)
December 1, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Royal Goode Productions LLC . (Rotstein, Robert)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Netflix INC . (Rotstein, Robert)
October 28, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Emily F. Evitt on behalf of Netflix INC, Royal Goode Productions LLC (Evitt, Emily)
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Henry Rotstein on behalf of Netflix INC, Royal Goode Productions LLC (Rotstein, Robert)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Netflix INC answer or response due 12/1/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/23/2020. (mb)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Netflix INC. (Morgan, Mack)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to Royal Goode Productions LLC. (kmt)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TIMESTAMPS CHART)(Free, Phillip)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily F. Evitt. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/14/2020. (mb)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert Henry Rotstein. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/14/2020. (mb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3321947 by Netflix INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Morgan, Mack)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3321936 by Netflix INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Morgan, Mack)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Netflix INC answer or response to Complaint due 11/9/2020.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/6/2020. (mb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Netflix INC. (Morgan, Mack)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Mack J Morgan, III on behalf of Netflix INC (Morgan, Mack)
September 16, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BOKWDC-3284484. (Free, Phillip)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Netflix INC. (kmt)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Netflix INC filed by Whyte Monkee Productions LLC, Timothy Sepi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - TIGERKING-DURATIONTIMESTAMP, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whyte Monkee Productions LLC et al v. Netflix INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whyte Monkee Productions LLC
Represented By: Phillip L Free, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Sepi
Represented By: Phillip L Free, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix INC
Represented By: Robert Henry Rotstein
Represented By: Emily F. Evitt
Represented By: Mack J Morgan, III
Represented By: Emily F Evitt
Represented By: Robert H Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Goode Productions LLC
Represented By: Robert Henry Rotstein
Represented By: Emily F. Evitt
Represented By: Emily F Evitt
Represented By: Mack J Morgan, III
Represented By: Robert H Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?