Headley v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Rudy Headley
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2020cv00947
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 22 SPECIALIZED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court sets the following deadlines, as more fully set out in Order. Status/Scheduling Conference set for 11/5/2020 is hereby canceled. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 10/30/2020. (dwl)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ~ re #20 Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan. The Court ADOPTS the Case Management Orders entered in the MDL and ENTERS Case Management Orders, as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 10/30/2020. (dwl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Master Responsive Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - CMO No. 4, #3 Exhibit 3 - Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Stipulated Protective Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - CMO No. 7, #6 Exhibit 6 - CMO No. 17 AMENDED, #7 Exhibit 7 - CMO No. 12, #8 Exhibit 8 - CMO No. 14, #9 Exhibit 9 - CMO No. 9, #10 Exhibit 10 - Pretrial Order No. 3, #11 Exhibit 11 - Stipulation and Filing Regarding Proposed Procedure for Party Fact Sheets, #12 Exhibit 12 - Caldera Case Management Order)(Griffith, Joseph)
October 22, 2020 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Curtis J Roberts on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Roberts, Curtis)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Status Conference set for 11/5/2020 2:00 PM in Rm 2017 before Honorable Bernard M. Jones. Status Report due by 10/26/2020. (dwl)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ~ Granting #16 Defendants' Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Following Remand. Richard B. North, Jr. is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Defendants, and Joseph P. Griffith is hereby substituted as counsel for Defendants in place of Mr. North. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 10/5/2020. (dwl)
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel Following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Griffith, Joseph)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph Griffith on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Griffith, Joseph)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan B Bass on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Bass, Jonathan)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ~ Granting #9 , #10 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jonathan B. Bass and Joseph P. Griffith are hereby admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case, provided each counsel submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 9/24/2020. (dwl)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated . (Buchan, J)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by C R Bard Incorporated . (Buchan, J)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph Griffith Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3296031 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission)(Buchan, J)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Bass Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3296028 by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission)(Buchan, J)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Micah J Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Petersen, Micah)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by J Craig Buchan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Buchan, J)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Docket Sheet from District of Arizona, MDL 15-2641-PHX-DGC. (knt)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 Transfer Order (Fourth) from the District of Arizona: MDL 15-2641-PHX-DGC. (knt)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01497.
September 18, 2020 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Oklahoma via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/21/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER (FOURTH). That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of this District is directed to transfer the cases listed on Schedule A to appropriate districts for further proceedings. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/10/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/21/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-01497-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/21/2020.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16607404 filed by Rudy Headley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Headley v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan B Bass
Represented By: J Craig Buchan
Represented By: Joseph Griffith
Represented By: Micah J Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan B Bass
Represented By: J Craig Buchan
Represented By: Joseph Griffith
Represented By: Micah J Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Headley
Represented By: Nicholas Farnolo
Represented By: Curtis J Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?