Parks v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Plaintiff: Garland Parks
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00975
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Skinner, Maris)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/21/2020 at 02:00 PM before the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Status Report due by 12/11/2020. (nv)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Equifax Information Services LLC. The Court extends the deadline for Equifax to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Doc. No. #1 to November 25, 2020. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 10/26/2020. (nv)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Skinner, Maris)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Equifax Information Services LLC . (Skinner, Maris)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Maris A Skinner on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Skinner, Maris)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Arthur F Hoge, III on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Hoge, Arthur)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry P Smith on behalf of Garland Parks (Smith, Larry)
September 28, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3303624. (Smith, Larry)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (em)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC filed by Garland Parks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garland Parks
Represented By: David M Marco
Represented By: Larry P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Maris A Skinner
Represented By: John W. Mee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?