Ogundipe v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Plaintiff: Florine Ogundipe
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Case Number: 5:2020cv00997
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Florine Ogundipe. (Martin, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2020 10:40 AM telephonically before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 11/25/2020. (jb)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court)(Brewer, Michael)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael P Martin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Martin, Michael)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Scott, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP . (Brewer, Michael)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Brewer, Michael)
October 2, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3312499. (Brewer, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-213 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Petition, #3 Exhibit 3- Summons, #4 Exhibit 4- Answer, #5 Exhibit 5- EOA, #6 Exhibit 6- EOA, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ogundipe v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florine Ogundipe
Represented By: Michael P Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?