Elk City City of v. Cephalon Inc et al
Plaintiff: Elk City City of
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, Keysource Medical Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, CVS Health Corporation, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Walgreens Co, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, CVS Pharmacy Inc and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv00998
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 20, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Expedite filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
November 17, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
November 6, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Expedite filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
November 6, 2020 Filing 46 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ada Stay Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seminole Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Osage Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pawnee Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Stay Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Granting Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - CTO 177, #8 Exhibit 8 - WI Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - CA Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit 16 - JPML 5737, #17 Exhibit 17 - JPML 6100, #18 Exhibit 18 - JPML 6538, #19 Exhibit 19 - Transfer Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - JPML 7403, #21 Exhibit 21 - JPML 7543, #22 Exhibit 22 - JPML 7573, #23 Exhibit 23 - JPML 7713, #24 Exhibit 24 - JPML 8583, #25 Exhibit 25 - Alameda Stay Order, #26 Exhibit 26 - Portland v. Purdue, #27 Exhibit 27 - EDVA Stay Order, #28 Exhibit 28 - WDVA Stay Order, #29 Exhibit 29 - CA Stay Order, #30 Exhibit 30 - IL Stay Order, #31 Exhibit 31 - FL Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
October 30, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Expedite by Elk City City of. (Court, Todd)
October 30, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION to Remand by Elk City City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
October 15, 2020 Filing 43 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by CVS Health Corporation . (White, Amy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 42 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by CVS Pharmacy Inc . (White, Amy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 41 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC . (White, Amy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 40 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy D White on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC (White, Amy)
October 15, 2020 Filing 39 ENTRY of Appearance by G Calvin Sharpe on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC (Sharpe, G)
October 15, 2020 Filing 38 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
October 15, 2020 Filing 37 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Evans, Kyle)
October 15, 2020 Filing 36 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc . (Holden, Steven)
October 15, 2020 Filing 35 ENTRY of Appearance by Steven E Holden on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc (Holden, Steven)
October 15, 2020 Filing 34 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Sparks, John)
October 15, 2020 Filing 33 ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John)
October 15, 2020 Filing 32 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael)
October 12, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY by Mallinckrodt LLC (Epstein, Jon)
October 12, 2020 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Mallinckrodt LLC . (Epstein, Jon)
October 12, 2020 Filing 29 ENTRY of Appearance by Jon Epstein on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC (Epstein, Jon)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc as set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 10/09/2020. (jb)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, Cardinal Health Inc, McKesson Corp as set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 10/09/2020. (jb)
October 9, 2020 Filing 26 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
October 9, 2020 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
October 9, 2020 Filing 23 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time as set forth herein. Each Defendant listed herein shall filed a disclosure statement as prescribed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 or Local Civil Rule 7.1.1 no later than October 15, 2020. Counsel for Defendants listed herein shall enter their appearance in accordance with Local Civil Rules 17.1 and 83.4 no later than October 15, 2020. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 10/08/2020. (jb)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as set forth herein. Each Defendant listed herein, with the exceptions of Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., shall filed a disclosure statement as prescribed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 or Local Civil Rule 7.1.1 no later than October 15, 2020. Counsel for Defendants listed herein, with the exceptions of Endo Health Solutions and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., shall enter their appearance in accordance with Local Civil Rules 17.1 and 83.4 no later than October 15, 2020. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 10/08/2020. (jb)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time as set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 10/08/2020. (jb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summonses, #4 Exhibit 4 - Appearance (Walgreens), #5 Exhibit 5 - Appearance (Quest), #6 Exhibit 6 - Motion for Extension (Quest), #7 Exhibit 7 - Order Granting Extension (McKesson), #8 Exhibit 8 - Order Granting Extension (Quest), #9 Exhibit 9 - Appearance (ABDC), #10 Exhibit 10 - Appearance (Cardinal), #11 Exhibit 11 - Appearance (Harvard), #12 Exhibit 12 - Appearance (McKesson), #13 Exhibit 13 - Motion for Extension (McKesson), #14 Exhibit 14 - Motion for Extension (CVS), #15 Exhibit 15 - Order Granting Extension (CVS), #16 Exhibit 16 - Notice of Removal, #17 Exhibit 17 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart)
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
October 8, 2020 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
October 8, 2020 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,, (to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (White, Amy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,, (to File Responsive Pleadings) by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,, by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Evans, Kyle)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan)
October 2, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3312931. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Beckham County, case number CJ-20-101 filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Documents, #2 Exhibit State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Petition, #4 Exhibit Summons to Cephalon, #5 Exhibit Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, #6 Exhibit Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #7 Exhibit Summons to Johnson and Johnson, #8 Exhibit Summons to Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, #9 Exhibit Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica, #10 Exhibit Summons to Endo Health Solutions, #11 Exhibit Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals, #12 Exhibit Summons to Allergan PLC, #13 Exhibit Summons to Actavis PLC, #14 Exhibit Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals, #15 Exhibit Summons to Watson Laboratories, #16 Exhibit Summons to Actavis Pharma, #17 Exhibit Summons to Watson Pharma, #18 Exhibit Summons to Actavis LLC, #19 Exhibit Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, #20 Exhibit Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC, #21 Exhibit ummons to McKesson, #22 Exhibit Summons to Cardinal Health, #23 Exhibit Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals, #24 Exhibit Summons to Anda Inc, #25 Exhibit Summons to Keysource Medical, #26 Exhibit Summons to Morris and Dickson, #27 Exhibit Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals, #28 Exhibit Summons to Harvard Drug Group, #29 Exhibit Summons to CVS Health Corporation, #30 Exhibit Summons to CVS Pharmacy, #31 Exhibit Summons to Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, #32 Exhibit Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance, #33 Exhibit Summons to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, #34 Exhibit Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Walgreens, #35 Exhibit Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Quest, #36 Exhibit Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest, #37 Exhibit Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Cardinal Health, #38 Exhibit Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Harvard Drug Group, #39 Exhibit Entry of Appearance by Attorney for ABDC, #40 Exhibit Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest, #41 Exhibit Entry of Appearance by Attorney for McKesson, #42 Exhibit Motion for Enlargement of Time by McKesson et al, #43 Exhibit Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time by McKesson et al, #44 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elk City City of v. Cephalon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt plc
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Jon Epstein
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co
Represented By: Steven E Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Amy D White
Represented By: G Calvin Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elk City City of
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Represented By: Matthew J Sill
Represented By: Harrison C Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?