Johnson v. Fitzgerald et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Johnson, III
Defendant: William Michael Fitzgerald and Transit TEC Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01077
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2021 10:15 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 12/30/2020. (llg)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by John Kim on behalf of William Michael Fitzgerald, Transit TEC Inc (Kim, John)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Transit TEC Inc . (McDevitt, Matthew)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew J G McDevitt on behalf of All Defendants (McDevitt, Matthew)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 Receipt for Money Received from William Michael Fitzgerald in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500082484 regarding #1 Notice of Removal, (kah)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of McClain County, case number CJ-20-129 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Kimberly Yennig, #2 Exhibit 2- Petition, #3 Exhibit 3- Summons to William Fitzgerald, #4 Exhibit 4- Summons to Transit Tec, #5 Exhibit 5- Dismissal, #6 Exhibit 6- Entry of Appearance, #7 Exhibit 7- Defendant's Answer, #8 Exhibit 8- Docket Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)
October 15, 2020 WESTERN DISTRICT CASE MANAGEMENT ENTRY: ANSWER to Petition by William Michael Fitzgerald, Transit TEC Inc.(llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Fitzgerald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Michael Fitzgerald
Represented By: John H Kim
Represented By: Matthew J G McDevitt
Represented By: John Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transit TEC Inc
Represented By: John H Kim
Represented By: Matthew J G McDevitt
Represented By: John Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Johnson, III
Represented By: Andrew D Schwartz
Represented By: James E Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?