United States of America v. Two (2) Firearms Three (3) Magazines and Fifty-Seven (57) Rounds of Ammunition
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Two (2) Firearms Three (3) Magazines and Fifty-Seven (57) Rounds of Ammunition
Case Number: 5:2020cv01123
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Docket Annotation: DETAILS: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma as case 4:20-cv-00590, filed 11/17/2020. (kmt)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 the United States' motion to transfer jurisdiction and venue is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 11/17/2020. (ks)
November 17, 2020 Docket Annotation: Civil case extracted and sent to the Northern District of Oklahoma. (ks)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer Case by United States of America. (Reininger, Reagan)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Two (2) Firearms Three (3) Magazines and Fifty-Seven (57) Rounds of Ammunition filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit In Support of Complaint for Forfiture in Rem, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Two (2) Firearms Three (3) Magazines and Fifty-Seven (57) Rounds of Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two (2) Firearms Three (3) Magazines and Fifty-Seven (57) Rounds of Ammunition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Reagan V Reininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?