KLX Energy Services LLC v. Magnesium Machine LLC
Plaintiff: KLX Energy Services LLC
Defendant: Magnesium Machine LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01129
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 17 ENTER ORDER STRIKING 1/5/2021 status/scheduling conference, STRIKING 12/30/2020 ddl for filing of joint status report. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/22/2020. (llg)
December 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims by KLX Energy Services LLC. (Whittlesey, David)
December 15, 2020 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael H Smith on behalf of Magnesium Machine LLC (Smith, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by David Philip Whittlesey on behalf of KLX Energy Services LLC (Whittlesey, David)
December 1, 2020 Filing 13 TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2021 11:00 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 12/30/2020. (llg)
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Magnesium Machine LLC . (McCormick, Jacqueline)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against KLX Energy Services LLC by Magnesium Machine LLC.(Carsey, Daniel)
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacqueline M McCormick on behalf of Magnesium Machine LLC (McCormick, Jacqueline)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel V Carsey on behalf of Magnesium Machine LLC (Carsey, Daniel)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by KLX Energy Services LLC . (Bradford, Reagan)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by KLX Energy Services LLC . (Bradford, Reagan)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David P. Whittlesey, provided counsel submits the ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance consistent with LCvR83.4. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 11/10/2020. (llg)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (David P. Whittlesey ) Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3369151 by KLX Energy Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bradford, Reagan)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan K Wilson on behalf of KLX Energy Services LLC (Wilson, Ryan)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Reagan E Bradford on behalf of KLX Energy Services LLC (Bradford, Reagan)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Magnesium Machine LLC. (dtb)
November 9, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE KLX Energy Services LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3366605. (Bradford, Reagan)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Magnesium Machine LLC filed by KLX Energy Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Distribution Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2- Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLX Energy Services LLC v. Magnesium Machine LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnesium Machine LLC
Represented By: Michael H Smith
Represented By: Daniel V Carsey
Represented By: Jacqueline M McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KLX Energy Services LLC
Represented By: Reagan E Bradford
Represented By: Ryan K Wilson
Represented By: David Philip Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?