MPower Inc v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MPower Inc
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv01183
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by MPower Inc . (Cartmell, Jordyn)
December 18, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(den Harder, Casper)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company filed by MPower Inc.(Engel, Adam)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company . (den Harder, Casper)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before December 11, 2020. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 11/30/20. (md)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Ethan M Sneed on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Sneed, Ethan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Phil R Richards on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Richards, Phil)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (den Harder, Casper)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Casper J den Harder on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (den Harder, Casper)
November 24, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AOKWDC-3400322. (Richards, Phil)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-5157 filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons OID Transmittal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Entries of Appearance, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MPower Inc v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Casper J den Harder
Represented By: Phil R Richards
Represented By: Ethan M Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MPower Inc
Represented By: Adam Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?