United States of America et al v. January Environmental Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and United States of America
Defendant: Cris January and January Environmental Services Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01205
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant Cris January. Cris January waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (Barbeau, Jason)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant January Environmental Services Inc. January Environmental Services Inc waiver sent on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (Barbeau, Jason)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald R Gallegos on behalf of United States of America (Gallegos, Ronald)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Lee E Dooley, I on behalf of Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality (Dooley, Lee)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon Robers on behalf of United States of America (Robers, Brandon)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason T Barbeau on behalf of United States of America (Barbeau, Jason)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cris January, January Environmental Services Inc filed by United States of America, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. January Environmental Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cris January
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: January Environmental Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality
Represented By: Lee E Dooley
Represented By: Lee E. Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jason T Barbeau
Represented By: Timothy J Downing
Represented By: Ronald R Gallegos
Represented By: Brandon Robers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?