Robles v. MVT Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erika Robles
Defendant: Mark Gaithe, MVT Services LLC, DMT Services Inc, Juan Garcia, Amilcar Estrada and Lima Truck Sales Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01225
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Brief in Support of Defendants MVT Services and Juan Garcia filed by MVT Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Signed Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 2-Comstock email, #3 Exhibit 3-Winningham email)(Pearson, Emily)
January 25, 2021 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Emily D Pearson on behalf of MVT Services LLC (Pearson, Emily)
January 11, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY by Defendant MVT Services LLC re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MVT Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1-A-Staff Leasing Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2-ORLR, #4 Exhibit 3-Training, #5 Exhibit 4-Dec Page)(Goodnight, F)
January 8, 2021 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Lima Truck Sales Inc . (Winningham, Gregory)
January 8, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lima Truck Sales Inc.(Winningham, Gregory)
January 4, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response to Defendant MVT Services, LLC and Juan Garcia's Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Erika Robles. (Medina, Jason)
January 4, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Brief in Support by Erika Robles. (Medina, Jason)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Answer or Other Response Out of Time. Lima Truck Sales, Inc., shall file an answer or other response to the Petition on or before January 8, 2021. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/29/20. (md)
December 28, 2020 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason M Medina on behalf of Erika Robles (Medina, Jason)
December 23, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Amilcar Estrada.(Winningham, Gregory)
December 23, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by MVT Services LLC . (Goodnight, F)
December 23, 2020 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Answer or Other Response Out of Time by Lima Truck Sales Inc. (Coble, Tyler)
December 22, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Gregory D Winningham on behalf of Amilcar Estrada, Lima Truck Sales Inc (Winningham, Gregory)
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Amilcar Estrada, Lima Truck Sales Inc (Riddles, D)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler J Coble on behalf of Amilcar Estrada, Lima Truck Sales Inc (Coble, Tyler)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #6 Disclosure Statement - Corporate filed by MVT Services LLC. Within seven days of the date of this Order, Defendant MVT Services, LLC shall file a supplemental disclosure statement in compliance with LCvR 7.1.1 as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/16/20. (md)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by DMT Services Inc . (Comstock, Christina)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Gerard T Fazio on behalf of Juan Garcia, MVT Services LLC (Fazio, Gerard)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy L Abel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abel, Timothy)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelly S Bishop on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bishop, Kelly)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by MVT Services LLC . (Goodnight, F)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by DMT Services Inc, Mark Gaithe.(Comstock, Christina)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Christina D Comstock on behalf of DMT Services Inc, Mark Gaithe (Comstock, Christina)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by MVT Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Castro)(Goodnight, F)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by F Jason Goodnight on behalf of MVT Services LLC (Goodnight, F)
December 7, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3433352. (Goodnight, F)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Sequoyah County, case number CJ-2020-137 filed by Mark Gaithe, DMT Services Inc, Lima Truck Sales Inc, Juan Garcia, Amilcar Estrada, MVT Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons MVT, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Garcia, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Lima, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons Estrada, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons DMT, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons Gaithe, #8 Exhibit 8 - ROS Garcia, #9 Exhibit 9 - Docket Sheet, #10 Exhibit 10 - Affidavit Castro, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robles v. MVT Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gaithe
Represented By: Phillip B Wilson
Represented By: Jennifer Ary Brown
Represented By: F Jason Goodnight
Represented By: Christina D Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MVT Services LLC
Represented By: Phillip B Wilson
Represented By: Jennifer Ary Brown
Represented By: F Jason Goodnight
Represented By: Emily D Pearson
Represented By: Gerard T Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMT Services Inc
Represented By: Phillip B Wilson
Represented By: Jennifer Ary Brown
Represented By: F Jason Goodnight
Represented By: Christina D Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Garcia
Represented By: Phillip B Wilson
Represented By: Jennifer Ary Brown
Represented By: F Jason Goodnight
Represented By: Emily D Pearson
Represented By: Gerard T Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amilcar Estrada
Represented By: Phillip B Wilson
Represented By: Jennifer Ary Brown
Represented By: F Jason Goodnight
Represented By: Tyler J Coble
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Represented By: Gregory D Winningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lima Truck Sales Inc
Represented By: Phillip B Wilson
Represented By: Jennifer Ary Brown
Represented By: F Jason Goodnight
Represented By: Tyler J Coble
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Represented By: Gregory D Winningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Robles
Represented By: Timothy L Abel
Represented By: Jason M Medina
Represented By: Kelly S Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?