Fuels Marketing INC v. Midcon Gathering LLC
Plaintiff: Fuels Marketing INC
Defendant: Midcon Gathering LLC and Midcon Fuel Services LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01226
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Midcon Gathering LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Fettinger, George)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave from Local Rule 83.3 by Midcon Gathering LLC. (Fettinger, George)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3505421 by Midcon Gathering LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Fettinger, George)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by George M Fettinger on behalf of Midcon Gathering LLC (Fettinger, George)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike #2 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Fuels Marketing INC. (Parker, Kelly)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Fuels Marketing INC. (Parker, Kelly)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelly M Parker on behalf of Fuels Marketing INC (Parker, Kelly)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Midcon Gathering LLC . (Fettinger, George)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Midcon Gathering LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Attachment proposed Order)(Fettinger, George)
December 7, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3433396. (Fettinger, George)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-5334 filed by Midcon Gathering LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuels Marketing INC v. Midcon Gathering LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midcon Gathering LLC
Represented By: George M Fettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midcon Fuel Services LLC
Represented By: George M Fettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuels Marketing INC
Represented By: Kelly M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?