CTC Inc v. Schneider National Inc et al
Plaintiff: CTC Inc
Defendant: Schneider National Inc and Schneider National Carriers Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01235
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants filed by CTC Inc.(Delluomo, Daniel)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 12/10/2020 Order, #5 Amended Complaint filed by CTC Inc. Plf is given leave to file a second amended complaint DUE within 14 days of the date of this order. The second amended complaint must either provide all missing jurisdictional information identified by the court in its orders or state plf's reasons for its inability to allege the required information. If, after reviewing the 12/10/2020 order & this order, plf is confused about what information must be alleged in support of diversity jurisdiction, plf may move for clarification, identifying which of the court's directives plf finds unclear. Absent compliance with the court's orders, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/8/2021. (llg)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CTC Inc.(Delluomo, Daniel)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Application for Enlargement of Time to File an Amended Complaint. Amended complaint due 1/7/2021. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/4/2021. (llg)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Delluomo, Daniel)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by CTC Inc. Plf is DIRECTED to file a First Amended Complaint which provides the missing jurisdictional information identified in this order. The First Amended Complaint is DUE within 14 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/10/2020. (llg)
December 9, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3441774. (Delluomo, Daniel)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CTC Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CTC Inc v. Schneider National Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTC Inc
Represented By: Daniel M Delluomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?