Mayfield v. Kidd et al
Plaintiff: Frankie Tiana Mayfield
Defendant: Shawn James Kidd and Ace Air Conditioning Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01246
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER - Pursuant to the provisions of the Order for Status/Scheduling Conference filed herein, the Court has determined that a formal Status/Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The Status/Scheduling Conference scheduled for February 4, 2021, is hereby STRICKEN and the following scheduling deadlines are entered: Motions to join due 3/4/2021; Motions to amend due 3/4/2021; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 8/2/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 8/16/2021; Pla witness list due 8/2/2021; Dft witness list due 8/16/2021; Pla exhibit list due 8/23/2021; Dft exhibit list due 8/30/2021; Stipulations due 10/1/2021; Motions in limine due 10/1/2021; Jury instructions due 10/1/2021; Voir dire requests due 10/1/2021; Trial briefs due 10/1/2021; Discovery due by 10/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Motions due by 9/1/2021. Pretrial Report due by 10/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 2/2/2021. (md)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendants Ace Air Conditioning Inc, Shawn James Kidd. (Coble, Tyler)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry E Finn on behalf of Frankie Tiana Mayfield (Finn, Larry)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 1/28/2021. (md)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Tim N Cheek on behalf of Ace Air Conditioning Inc, Shawn James Kidd (Cheek, Tim)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ace Air Conditioning Inc . (Coble, Tyler)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by All Defendants.(Coble, Tyler)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler J Coble on behalf of All Defendants (Coble, Tyler)
December 14, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3451341. (Coble, Tyler)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-3672 filed by Ace Air Conditioning Inc, Shawn James Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Aff of NonService, #3 Exhibit 3 - Aff of Service, #4 Exhibit 4 - Amended Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - OSCN Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayfield v. Kidd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Tiana Mayfield
Represented By: Larry E Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn James Kidd
Represented By: Tyler J Coble
Represented By: Tim N Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Air Conditioning Inc
Represented By: Tyler J Coble
Represented By: Tim N Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?