Stillwater City of v. Cephalon Inc et al
Plaintiff: Stillwater City of
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Keysource Medical Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Watson Pharma Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, Physicians Total Care Inc, Allergan plc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, McKesson Corp, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, CVS Health Corporation, Activas PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, GCP Pharma LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis LLC, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Walgreen Co, CVS Pharmacy Inc and Anda Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01269
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Quest Pharmaceuticals Incshall file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Petition no later than 60 days following the latter of a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or finally denying transfer of this action, or thisCourts ruling on any motion to remand.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/16/2021. (mb)
February 15, 2021 Filing 32 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Riddles, D)
February 15, 2021 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Riddles, D)
February 15, 2021 Filing 30 ENTRY of Appearance by D Todd Riddles on behalf of Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc (Riddles, D)
February 10, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
February 9, 2021 Filing 28 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ada Stay Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Seminole Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Osage Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pawnee Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Delaware Stay Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Granting Stay, #7 Exhibit 7 - CTO 177, #8 Exhibit 8 - WI Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - CA Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 10 - KY Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 11 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - 1 Cty Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - 7 Cty Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6 Cty Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - JPML 5422, #16 Exhibit 16 - JPML 5737, #17 Exhibit 17 - JPML 6100, #18 Exhibit 18 - JPML 6538, #19 Exhibit 19 - Transfer Order, #20 Exhibit 20 - JPML 7403, #21 Exhibit 21 - JPML 7543, #22 Exhibit 22 - JPML 7573, #23 Exhibit 23 - JPML 7713, #24 Exhibit 24 - JPML 8583, #25 Exhibit 25 - Harmon Transfer Order, #26 Exhibit 26 - Alameda CA Stay Order, #27 Exhibit 27 - City of Portland v. Purdue, #28 Exhibit 28 - EDVA Stay Order, #29 Exhibit 29 - WDVA Stay Order, #30 Exhibit 30 - CA Stay Order, #31 Exhibit 31 - IL Stay Order, #32 Exhibit 32 - FL Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 9, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Remand filed by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Statement of Interest, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order)(Campbell, Stuart)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend the Time to Answer,Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Distributor Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to the Petition no later than 60 days following the latter of 1) a decision by the JPML granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or finally denying transfer of this action, or 2) this Courts ruling on any motion toremand. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/4/2021. (mb)
January 20, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand by Stillwater City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trotter v. Smith, #2 Exhibit 2 - Adams v. Wyeth)(Court, Todd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart)
January 5, 2021 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Cardinal Health Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
January 5, 2021 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Harvard Drug Group LLC The . (Ray, Ryan)
January 5, 2021 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Harvard Drug Group LLC The (Ray, Ryan)
January 5, 2021 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Cardinal Health Inc (Ray, Ryan)
December 30, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summonses, #4 Exhibit 4 - Appearance (McKesson), #5 Exhibit 5 - Motion for Extension (McKesson), #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Granting Extension (McKesson), #7 Exhibit 7 - Appearance (ABDC), #8 Exhibit 8 - Appearance (Cardinal), #9 Exhibit 9 - Appearance (Harvard), #10 Exhibit 10 - Order Granting Extension (Quest), #11 Exhibit 11 - Motion for Extension (CVS), #12 Exhibit 12 - Motion for Extension (Quest), #13 Exhibit 13 - Appearance (Quest), #14 Exhibit 14 - Notice of Notice of Removal, #15 Exhibit 15 - Order Granting Extension (CVS), #16 Exhibit 16 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart)
December 30, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart)
December 30, 2020 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/30/20. (kmt)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/30/20. (kmt)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/29/20. (kmt)
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. (White, Amy)
December 28, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Evans, Kyle)
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Evans, Kyle)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (McBride, D)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Huntsman, Susan)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp . (Anderson, Elliot)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Elliot P Anderson on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp (Anderson, Elliot)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,, (to File Responsive Pleadings) by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 21, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3471561. (Zschiesche, Raymond)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Payne County, case number CJ-2020-428 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons - Cephalon Inc, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons - Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons - Johnson and Johnson, #8 Exhibit 8 - Summons - Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #9 Exhibit 9 - Summons - Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #10 Exhibit 10 - Summons - Endo Health Solutions Inc, #11 Exhibit 11 - Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #12 Exhibit 12 - Summons - Allergan PLC, #13 Exhibit 13 - Summons - Actavis PLC, #14 Exhibit 14 - Summons - Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #15 Exhibit 15 - Summons - Watson Laboratories Inc, #16 Exhibit 16 - Summons, #17 Exhibit 17 - Summons - Watson Pharma Inc, #18 Exhibit 18 - Summons - Activis LLC, #19 Exhibit 19 - Summons - McKesson Corp, #20 Exhibit 20 - Summons - Cardinal Health Inc, #21 Exhibit 21 - Summons - Anda Pharmaceuticals, #22 Exhibit 22 - Summons - Anda Inc, #23 Exhibit 23 - Summons - Keysource Medical Inc, #24 Exhibit 24 - Summons - Morris and Dickson Co LLC, #25 Exhibit 25 - Summons - Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #26 Exhibit 26 - Summons - The Harvard Drug Group LLC, #27 Exhibit 27 - Summons - CVS Health Corporation, #28 Exhibit 28 - CVS Pharmacy Inc, #29 Exhibit 29 - Summons - Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #30 Exhibit 30 - Summons - Walgreens Boots Alliance dba Walgreen Co, #31 Exhibit 31 - AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp, #32 Exhibit 32 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney, #33 Exhibit 33 - Motion for Enlargement of Time by McKesson, #34 Exhibit 34 - Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time by McKesson et al, #35 Exhibit 35 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney for AmerisourceBergen, #36 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stillwater City of v. Cephalon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keysource Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: D Todd Riddles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Total Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corp
Represented By: Stuart D Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Drug Group LLC The
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activas PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael W Ridgeway
Represented By: John H Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Raymond E Zschiesche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCP Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Represented By: Robert G McCampbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corp
Represented By: D Michael McBride, III
Represented By: Susan E Huntsman
Represented By: Elliot P Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Amy D White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stillwater City of
Represented By: Todd A Court
Represented By: Tony G Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?