Loma v. Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Plaintiff: Dawn Loma
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01270
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the December 2021 trial docket (12/7/2021 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 10/1/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 10/11/2021; Pla witness list due 10/1/2021; Dft witness list due 10/11/2021; Pla exhibit list due 10/1/2021; Dft exhibit list due 10/11/2021; Motions in limine due 11/16/2021; Jury instructions due 11/16/2021; Voir dire requests due 11/16/2021; Trial briefs due 11/16/2021; Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Motions due by 10/1/2021. Pretrial Report due by 11/16/2021; (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 2/2/2021. (ks)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Dawn Loma. (Jackson, Scott)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court)(Brewer, Michael)
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 FEBRUARY STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/2/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 1/26/2021. (ks)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Scott R Jackson on behalf of Dawn Loma (Jackson, Scott)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. (Scott, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. . (Brewer, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.. (Brewer, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. (Brewer, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court for Payne County, case number CJ-2020-208 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Petition, #3 Exhibit 3- Summons, #4 Exhibit 4- Defendant's Answer, #5 Exhibit 5- Entry of Appearance Michael Brewer, #6 Exhibit 6- Entry of Appearance Jeffrey Scott, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)
December 21, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3471426. (Brewer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loma v. Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Loma
Represented By: Scott R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?