Griggs v. Wingard Transport LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kelly J Griggs
Defendant: Wingard Transport LLC, Jonathan Wingard and John D Custar
Intervenor: CRST Expedited, Inc. and ACE American Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv01287
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 21 (TEXT ONLY) ORDER. In light of the filing of #19 Amended Motion to Intervene by CRST Expedited Inc, and upon the advice of intervenor counsel that the original motion to intervene was filed in error, the court STRIKES AS MOOT #17 Motion to Intervene by ACE American Insurance Company. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/5/2021. (llg)
February 5, 2021 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by CRST Expedited, Inc. . (Kershaw, Brian)
February 5, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED MOTION to Intervene by CRST Expedited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition in Intervention)(Kershaw, Brian)
February 5, 2021 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian P Kershaw on behalf of CRST Expedited, Inc. (Kershaw, Brian)
February 4, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Intervene by ACE American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kershaw, Brian)
February 4, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian P Kershaw on behalf of ACE American Insurance Company (Kershaw, Brian)
February 4, 2021 NOTICE from the Court re #17 ACE American Insurance Company's Motion to Intervene and Brief in Support. Counsel for the intervenor is DIRECTED, in future filings, to comply with the court's ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, Section II.A.4.a. - "... A description [more than just the exhibit no.] of the numbered exhibit must be provided in the docket entry...." Failure to comply in the future may result in filings being stricken. (llg)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due 3/1/2021; Motions to amend due 3/1/2021; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 8/20/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 21 days t/a; Pla witness list due 9/10/2021; Dft witness list due 14 days t/a; Pla exhibit list due 9/10/2021; Dft exhibit list due 14 days t/a; Motions in limine due 12/21/2021; Jury instructions & verdict forms due 12/21/2021; Voir dire requests due 12/21/2021; Trial briefs due 12/21/2021; Case Referred to Mediator; ADR Completion Date 9/15/2021. Discovery due by 12/15/2021. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 401 before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 10/1/2021. Pretrial Report due by 12/21/2021. Entered at the direction of Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 2/2/2021. (llg)
January 28, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Kelly J Griggs. (Self, James)
January 15, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by All Defendants.(Kolker, Paul)
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 EMAIL from Courtroom Deputy Lori Gray to Oklahoma State Attorney General. (llg)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Notice of Constitutional Question filed by Wingard Transport LLC, Jonathan Wingard, John D Custar. The Okla State Atty General is granted leave to intervene in this action for purposes of presenting evidence & argument on the constitutional challenge raised by dfts. The AG may intervene within 60 days of the date of this order. The clerk is DIRECTED to provide the AG with a copy of this order, a copy of #9 Defendants' Notice of Constitutional Question, a copy of #7 Defendants' Answer, & a copy of the court's docket sheet in this action. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/8/2021. (llg)
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/2/2021 09:30 AM before Honorable Stephen P. Friot. Status Report due by 1/28/2021. (llg)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE (other) by All Defendants re #7 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer to Attorney General of The State of Oklahoma (Kolker, Paul)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kelly J Griggs.(Self, James)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Kolker, Paul)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Brad L Roberson on behalf of All Defendants (Roberson, Brad)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul M Kolker on behalf of All Defendants (Kolker, Paul)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by James F Self, Jr on behalf of Kelly J Griggs (Self, James)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Kelly J Griggs. Plf is DIRECTED to file, within 14 days of the date of this order, a first amended complaint which provides the missing jurisdictional information identified in this order. Allegations may be based on information and belief. Absent compliance, this action may be dismissed without prejudice or other measures may be taken. Signed by Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 12/30/2020. (llg)
December 29, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3488550. (Self, James)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (dtb)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kelly J Griggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griggs v. Wingard Transport LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wingard Transport LLC
Represented By: Paul M Kolker
Represented By: Brad L Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Wingard
Represented By: Paul M Kolker
Represented By: Brad L Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Custar
Represented By: Paul M Kolker
Represented By: Brad L Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly J Griggs
Represented By: James F Self, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: CRST Expedited, Inc.
Represented By: Brian P Kershaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian P Kershaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?