Williams v. Dollar Tree Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: Darryl C Williams
Defendant: DH Pace Company Inc and Dollar Tree Stores Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01303
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 7/5/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 7/20/2021; Pla witness list due 7/5/2021; Dft witness list due 7/20/2021; Pla exhibit list due 7/20/2021; Dft exhibit list due 8/5/2021; Motions in limine due 10/1/2021; Jury instructions due 10/1/2021; Voir dire requests due 10/1/2021; Trial briefs due 10/1/2021; ( Discovery due by 9/5/2021., Jury Trial set on the Court's 11/2021 trial docket before Honorable Bernard M. Jones., Motions due by 8/1/2021., Pretrial Report due by 10/1/2021.) Status/Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2021 is hereby canceled. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 2/23/2021. (dwl)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Darryl C Williams. (Finn, Larry)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Status/Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2021 10:20 AM in Rm 2017 before Honorable Bernard M. Jones. Status Report due by 2/22/2021. (dwl)
December 31, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by DH Pace Company Inc . (Poovey, Joshua)
December 31, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3494337. (Davis, J)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Dollar Tree Stores Inc . (Bowman, Andrew)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Dollar Tree Stores Inc.(Bowman, Andrew)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE (other) by Dollar Tree Stores Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent (Bowman, Andrew)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley M Thul on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores Inc (Thul, Ashley)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew M Bowman on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores Inc (Bowman, Andrew)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2020-5850 filed by DH Pace Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - EOA - Finn for Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Return of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer, #6 Exhibit 6 - EOA - JDP, #7 Exhibit 7 - EOA - JCD, #8 Exhibit 8 - Dollar Tree Commonwealth of Virginia State Corporation Commission Filing, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Dollar Tree Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DH Pace Company Inc
Represented By: J Christopher Davis
Represented By: Joshua D Poovey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores Inc
Represented By: Andrew M Bowman
Represented By: Ashley M Thul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl C Williams
Represented By: Larry E Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?