McDonald's Corporation v. Dill Oil Company LLC
Plaintiff: McDonald's Corporation
Defendant: Dill Oil Company LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv01306
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Compel Dispute Resolution Process MOTION to Stay Case Pending Dispute Resolution Process filed by Dill Oil Company LLC. (Todd, Jeff)
February 22, 2021 Filing 28 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff McDonald's Corporation Re: #27 Response to Motion,, (Wahby, Peter)
February 22, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Compel Dispute Resolution Process MOTION to Stay Case Pending Dispute Resolution Process filed by McDonald's Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lease (FILED UNDER SEAL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter Past Due Invoices, #3 Exhibit 3 - March 2019 Demand (FILED UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit 4 - April 2019 Dill Letter (FILED UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit 5 - August 2019 McDonald's Letter (FILED UNDER SEAL), #6 Exhibit 6 - September 2019 Greenberg Traurig Letter (FILED UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit 7 - June 2020 Greenberg Traurig Letter (FILED UNDER SEAL))(Wahby, Peter)
February 22, 2021 Filing 26 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff McDonald's Corporation Re: #25 MOTION to Dismiss (McDonald's Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (Wahby, Peter)
February 22, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss (McDonald's Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by McDonald's Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lease (FILED UNDER SEAL))(Wahby, Peter)
February 22, 2021 NOTICE FROM THE COURT #21 MOTION to Dismiss (McDonald's Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fule 12(b)(6)), #24 Sealed Exhibit, #23 Response to Motion, #22 Sealed Exhibit are all STRICKEN due to Counsel's failure to comply with ECF Policies & Procedures Manual, Section II.A.4.a. Counsel is directed to re-file these documents in accordance with the Policies & Procedures Manual. Further, Counsel is requested to place a cover page on all sealed exhibits to include the style of the case. (md)
February 19, 2021 Filing 24 STRICKEN SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff McDonald's Corporation Re: #23 Response to Motion, (Wahby, Peter) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 2/22/2021 (md).
February 19, 2021 Filing 23 STRICKEN RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Compel Dispute Resolution Process MOTION to Stay Case Pending Dispute Resolution Process filed by McDonald's Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit D - FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit E - FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit F - FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit G - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Wahby, Peter) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 2/22/2021 (md).
February 19, 2021 Filing 22 STRICKEN SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff McDonald's Corporation Re: #21 MOTION to Dismiss (McDonald's Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fule 12(b)(6)) (Wahby, Peter) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 2/22/2021 (md).
February 19, 2021 Filing 21 STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss (McDonald's Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims Pursuant to Fule 12(b)(6)) by McDonald's Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Wahby, Peter) Pursuant to Notice from the Court on 2/22/2021 (md).
February 18, 2021 Filing 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 2/18/2021. (md)
February 17, 2021 Filing 19 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order (Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order) by McDonald's Corporation. (Wahby, Peter)
February 2, 2021 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Dill Oil Company LLC . (Todd, Jeff)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Disclosure Statement - LLC filed by Dill Oil Company LLC. Within seven days of the date of this Order,Defendant shall file an amended disclosure statement in compliance with LCvR 7.1.1. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 2/2/2021. (md)
February 1, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Dill Oil Company LLC . (Todd, Jeff)
January 29, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against McDonald's Corporation by Dill Oil Company LLC.(Todd, Jeff)
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Compel Dispute Resolution Process, MOTION to Stay Case Pending Dispute Resolution Process by Dill Oil Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Edmond Lease Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Warr Acres Lease Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - NE 10th Lease Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 4 - NW 39th Lease Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sooner Road Lease Excerpts)(Todd, Jeff)
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Russell C Lissuzzo, III on behalf of Dill Oil Company LLC (Lissuzzo, Russell)
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeff L Todd on behalf of Dill Oil Company LLC (Todd, Jeff)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McDonald's Corporation. Dill Oil Company LLC served on 1/8/2021. (Webber, Daniel)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Allison Stewart on behalf of McDonald's Corporation (Stewart, Allison)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter S Wahby on behalf of McDonald's Corporation (Wahby, Peter)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter Wahby; and granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allison Stewart. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 12/31/20. (md)
December 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Allison Stewart Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3495005 by McDonald's Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Stewart Request for Admission)(Webber, Daniel)
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Peter Wahby Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3494876 by McDonald's Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Wahby Request for Admission)(Webber, Daniel)
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McDonald's Corporation . (Webber, Daniel)
December 31, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Chance L Pearson on behalf of McDonald's Corporation (Pearson, Chance)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel G Webber, Jr on behalf of McDonald's Corporation (Webber, Daniel)
December 31, 2020 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3494847. (Webber, Daniel)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Dill Oil Company LLC. (kmt)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dill Oil Company LLC filed by McDonald's Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald's Corporation v. Dill Oil Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McDonald's Corporation
Represented By: Daniel G Webber, Jr
Represented By: Chance L Pearson
Represented By: Allison Stewart
Represented By: Peter S Wahby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dill Oil Company LLC
Represented By: Jeff L Todd
Represented By: Russell C Lissuzzo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?