Miller Mendel, Inc. et al v. City of Oklahoma City
Plaintiff: Miller Mendel Inc and Tyler Miller
Defendant: City of Oklahoma City
Petitioner: Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020mc00004
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Opposed filed by Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc. (Nelson, Todd)
April 14, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Opposed filed by City of Oklahoma City. (Talley, Evan)
April 14, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Opposed filed by Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc.. (Talley, Evan)
March 25, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc. (Nelson, Todd)
March 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Opposed by Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc. (Nelson, Todd)
March 23, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc.. (Talley, Evan)
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc. (Nelson, Todd)
March 18, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY by Movant Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc. re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1 filed by Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cooley VC Sample Due Diligence Checklist)(Talley, Evan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Evan W Talley on behalf of City of Oklahoma City (Talley, Evan)
March 11, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION by Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Kurt Rylander). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Talley 5212019 email, #2 Exhibit 2-Talley 5242019 email, #3 Exhibit 3-Rylander service email)(Nelson, Todd)
March 11, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Nonparty Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Requests)(Nelson, Todd)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Todd A Nelson on behalf of Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc (Nelson, Todd)
March 10, 2020 NOTICE from the Court #9 Response in Opposition to Motion, #8 Entry of Appearance, #10 Declaration, STRICKEN due to counsel's failure to comply with Doc. No. #7 Order Reassigning Case, which requires proper case initials to ensure prompt distribution of filings to the proper judge. Counsel to refile. (nv)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 STRICKEN DECLARATION by Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc re #9 Response in Opposition to Motion (Declaration of Kurt Rylander). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Talley 5212019 email, #2 Exhibit 2-Talley 5242019 email, #3 Exhibit 3-Rylander service email)(Nelson, Todd)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 STRICKEN RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 Nonparty Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Requests)(Nelson, Todd)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 STRICKEN ENTRY of Appearance by Todd A Nelson on behalf of Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel Inc (Nelson, Todd)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Honorable Patrick R Wyrick no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 3/9/2020. (ks)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:20-mc-00018.
March 5, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, served on Paul E. Rossler NCAED, Kurt M. Rylander NCAED, Douglas J. Sorocco NCAED. (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/5/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/4/2020 ORDERING that nonparty Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc.'s #1 Motion to Quash the Subpoena served by Miller Mendel, Inc. and Tyler Miller is hereby TRANSFERRED to U.S. District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma. (Reader, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/5/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Transfer of Subpoena-Related Motion re #1 Motion to Quash by Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc.. (Flynn, Sherrie) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/5/2020.]
January 31, 2020 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: 3 Minute Order served on Paul E. Rossler NCAED, Kurt M. Rylander NCAED, Douglas J. Sorocco NCAED. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/5/2020.]
January 31, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 3 Minute Order Set/Reset Motion Hearing served on Tyler Miller, Miller Mendel, Inc. (Buzo, P) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/5/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ONLY) by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/31/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Due to the court's unavailability, nonparty Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc., #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena scheduled for hearing for 2/28/2020, is continued to 3/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Parties may appear at the hearing telephonically. To arrange telephonic appearance, the parties shall contact the undersigned no later than forty-eight hours before the scheduled hearing to make arrangements. I HEREBY CERTIFY that the foregoing is a true and correct statement of an order made in the above-captioned case.(Buzo, P) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/5/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc. re #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flynn, Sherrie) Modified on 1/29/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/5/2020.]
January 27, 2020 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED. (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/5/2020.]
January 24, 2020 PAYMENT for miscellaneous case filing fee in the amount of $ 47, receipt number 0972-8691098. (Flynn, Sherrie) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/5/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to QUASH SUBPOENA by Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc., Attorney Flynn, Sherrie Marie added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Evan W. Talley, #2 Exhibit 1), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flynn, Sherrie) [Transferred from California Eastern on 3/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller Mendel, Inc. et al v. City of Oklahoma City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller Mendel Inc
Represented By: Kurt M. Rylander, NCAED
Represented By: Paul E. Rossler, NCAED
Represented By: Todd A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Miller
Represented By: Kurt M. Rylander, NCAED
Represented By: Paul E. Rossler, NCAED
Represented By: Todd A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oklahoma City
Represented By: Douglas J. Sorocco, NCAED
Represented By: Evan W Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Sherrie Marie Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?