Cruikshank v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Plaintiff: Josephina Cruikshank
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP doing business as Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00027
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. Motions in limine due 3/7/2022; Jury instructions due 3/7/2022; Voir dire requests due 3/7/2022; Trial briefs due 3/7/2022; Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions due 3/7/2022; Discovery due by 12/13/2021. Jury Trial set for 4/12/2022 09:30 AM in Courtroom 502 before Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Motions due by 12/13/2021. Pretrial Report due by 3/7/2022. See order for all deadlines and details. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 02/25/2021. (nv)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Kenyatta R Bethea on behalf of Josephina Cruikshank (Bethea, Kenyatta)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Josephina Cruikshank. (Bethea, Kenyatta)
January 21, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET. Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 502 before the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman. Status Report due by 2/17/2021. (nv)
January 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court)(Brewer, Michael)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Scott, Jeffrey)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP . (Brewer, Michael)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Brewer, Michael)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2020-5852 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Answer, #5 Exhibit 5 - EOA MB, #6 Exhibit 6 - EOA JDS, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)
January 14, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3531142. (Brewer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruikshank v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP doing business as Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Michael W Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey D Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephina Cruikshank
Represented By: Kenyatta R Bethea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?