Martinez v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Miguel Martinez
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2021cv00033
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO AGENCY HAVING CUSTODY OF PLAINTIFF FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 3/10/2021. (cps)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE. Please see Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 3/10/2021. (cps)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 Receipt for Money Received from Miguel Martinez in the amount of $96.33, receipt number OKW500084428 regarding #1 Complaint. Remaining balance 253.67. Receipt mailed to Miguel Martinez#39201-177SEAGOVILLE-FCIPO Box 9000Seagoville, TX 75159 (dtb)
March 1, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER from Miguel Martinez (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (dtb)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth hereafter. See Order for further details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 2/22/2021. (cps)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Miguel Martinez. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Inmate Inquiry, #2 Envelope)(dtb)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #4 Order, filed by Miguel Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is directed to show cause through a written submission to the Court, no later than March 3, 2021, why this case should not be dismissed based upon Plaintiff's failure submit an Amended Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and/or comply with the Court's Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 2/12/2021. (cps)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Order, as to Miguel Martinez (dtb)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY. ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by the 8th day of February, 2021. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to the Plaintiff along with this Order copies of the court-approved in forma pauperis form. Otherwise, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/20/2021. (cps)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell.Signed at the direction of The Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 1/19/21. (dtb)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Miguel Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Miguel Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1- Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?