Stow v. Home Depot USA Inc
Plaintiff: Daniel Stow
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00035
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. This matter is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell for a settlement conference pursuant to LCvR 16.2. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/04/2021. (jb)
March 4, 2021 Filing 19 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Protective Order filed by Home Depot USA Inc. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/04/2021. (jb)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due within 14 days; Motions to amend due within 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 06/21/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 21 days thereafter; Pla witness list due 07/05/2021; Dft witness list due 14 days thereafter; Pla exhibit list due 07/05/2021; Dft exhibit list due 14 days thereafter; Motions in limine due 10/04/2021; Jury instructions due 10/04/2021; Voir dire requests due 10/04/2021; Trial briefs due 10/04/2021; Discovery due by 9/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 305 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Motions due by 8/2/2021. Pretrial Report due by 10/4/2021.. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 03/04/2021. (jb)
March 2, 2021 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Protective Order by Home Depot USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Ewert, Robert)
February 18, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Daniel Stow. (Donahoe, Laurence)
February 9, 2021 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Home Depot USA Inc (Amended). (Ewert, Robert)
February 9, 2021 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Home Depot USA Inc. (Ewert, Robert)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue. The parties' status and scheduling conference shall be conducted telephonically on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 02/08/2021. (jb)
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Status and Scheduling Conference by Daniel Stow. (Donahoe, Laurence)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom 305 before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 2/24/2021. (jb)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 01/25/2021. (jb)
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Home Depot USA Inc. (Teague, J)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Home Depot USA Inc . (Ewert, Robert)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert A Ewert on behalf of Home Depot USA Inc (Ewert, Robert)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave. Mr. Ewert shall file an entry of appearance within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. In addition, Defendant shall file its disclosure statement in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 or Local Civil Rule 7.1.1 with seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 01/21/2021. (jb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave For Relief from Local Rule Requiring Association of Local Counsel by Home Depot USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Ewert, Robert)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 01/20/2021. (jb)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Document #1 Notice of Removal, and Instant Motion by All Plaintiffs. (Donahoe, Laurence)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Laurence K Donahoe on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Donahoe, Laurence)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-5357 filed by Home Depot USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendant's Answer to Petition, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Settlement Demand, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)
January 15, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Notice of Removal Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3535148. (Ewert, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stow v. Home Depot USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Stow
Represented By: Laurence K Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Represented By: J Derrick Teague
Represented By: Linda G Kaufmann
Represented By: Robert A Ewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?