Combs v. Crow
Petitioner: Franklin Savoy Combs
Respondent: Director DOC Scott Crow
Case Number: 5:2021cv00139
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1153
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE (other) titled "In Response to CIV-21-139-JD Pursuant to Rules of 2254 (Rule 8,(B), (3, 4)" by Franklin Savoy Combs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copy of Order Filed 03/31/2021, #2 Envelope)(knt)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley L Willis on behalf of Scott Crow (Willis, Ashley)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Response re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Franklin Savoy Combs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 3/31/2021. (rb)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 Receipt for Money Received from Franklin Savoy Combs in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500084533 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Receipt mailed to Franklin Savoy Combs #719244 SAYRE-NFCC 1605 E Main Sayre, OK 73662 (kah)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 3/8/2021. (rb)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 02/22/2021. (em)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases (em)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Franklin Savoy Combs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(em)
February 22, 2021 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, Doc #1 , and Doc #3 to Franklin Savoy Combs #719244 SAYRE-NFCC 1605 E Main Sayre, OK 73662 (em)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs v. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director DOC Scott Crow
Represented By: Ashley L Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Franklin Savoy Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?