Fuston v. Farris
Petitioner: Ronnie Eugene Fuston
Respondent: Jim Farris
Case Number: 5:2021cv00179
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 Receipt for Money Received from Ronnie Eugene Fuston in the amount of $5, receipt number OKW500084948. Mailed receipt to Ronnie Eugene Fuston #769086 MCALESTER-OSP P O Box 97 McAlester, OK 74502-0097 (jjs)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 4/8/2021. (cps)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell: Death Penalty Case Management Conference Hearing held on 4/8/2021. (cps)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua L Lockett on behalf of Jim Farris (Lockett, Joshua)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jennifer L Crabb on behalf of Jim Farris (Crabb, Jennifer)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Emma V Rolls on behalf of Ronnie Eugene Fuston (Rolls, Emma)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Callie Heller on behalf of Ronnie Eugene Fuston (Heller, Callie)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Court hereby sets a case management conference in thiscase for April 8, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 3/4/2021. (rb)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. the Court appoints the Federal Public Defender's Office, 215 Dean A. McGee, Suite 707, Oklahoma City, Oklahoma 73102, (405) 609-5930, to represent Petitioner in federal habeas corpus proceedings before this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 3/4/2021. (rb)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ronnie Eugene Fuston. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kmt).
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie Eugene Fuston. (kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuston v. Farris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronnie Eugene Fuston
Represented By: Emma V Rolls
Represented By: Callie Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Farris
Represented By: Jennifer L Crabb
Represented By: Joshua L Lockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?