Stallcup et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Chad Chappell, Casey Vance and Robert Stallcup
Defendant: Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo LLC and 3M Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00207
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Florida Northern for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (knt)
March 29, 2021 Docket Annotation: Case electronically sent to the Northern District of Florida. (knt)
March 29, 2021 Docket Annotation: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Northern District of Florida as case 3:21-cv-00531, filed 03/29/2021 (knt)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER...the parties' joint motion for stay #12 is granted...these proceedings are STAYED until the Judicial Panel on MDL decides the pending the petition to transfer and consolidate this case pursuant to 28:1407...defendants' motion for extension of time #11 is stricken as moot. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 03/19/2021. (lam)
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case /Proceedings Pending Rulings by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Brief in Support by 3M Company, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Petition, #2 Exhibit 2-Associated Cases, #3 Exhibit 3-Order Granting Joint Motions to Stay, #4 Exhibit 4-Conditional Transfer Order)(Maloan, Michael)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time , FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead and Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Maloan, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 ENTER ORDER counsel for the parties are directed to file their entries of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 03/16/2021. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 03/12/2021. (lam)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Aearo Technologies LLC . (Maloan, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Aearo LLC . (Maloan, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Aearo Intermediate LLC . (Maloan, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Aearo Holding LLC . (Maloan, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by 3M Occupational Safety LLC . (Maloan, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by 3M Company . (Maloan, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by All Defendants . (Maloan, Michael)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael T Maloan on behalf of All Defendants (Maloan, Michael)
March 12, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3641541. (Maloan, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Comanche County District Court, case number CJ-2020-493 filed by Aearo Holding LLC, 3M Company, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, Aearo LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons Served on 3M Company, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Served on Aearo Technologies LLC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Served on Aearo LLC, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallcup et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Chappell
Represented By: Daniel M Delluomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Vance
Represented By: Daniel M Delluomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stallcup
Represented By: Daniel M Delluomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Holding LLC
Represented By: Michael T Maloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Intermediate LLC
Represented By: Michael T Maloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Michael T Maloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Occupational Safety LLC
Represented By: Michael T Maloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo LLC
Represented By: Michael T Maloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Michael T Maloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?