Kopchick v. Vision Bank NA
Plaintiff: Kristiana Kopchick
Defendant: Vision Bank NA
Case Number: 5:2021cv00227
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 04/21/2021. (lam)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of deadline...defendant shall file its answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint not later than 04/26/2021. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 04/14/2021. (lam)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 ENTER ORDER. Case reassigned to Honorable Joe Heaton for all further proceedings. Please note that for future filings in this case, the letter at the end of the number should now be a "HE" rather than a(n) "JD". This is important to ensure the prompt distribution of pleadings to the proper judge. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 04/12/2021. (nv)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Jodi W. Dishman recused. The Clerk of Court is directed to place this case number in the random draw for reassignment to another Judge of the Court. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 04/12/2021. (nv)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Vision Bank NA . (Whatley, Nathan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Vision Bank NA. (Whatley, Nathan)
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathan L Whatley on behalf of Vision Bank NA (Whatley, Nathan)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Vision Bank NA. (knt)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vision Bank NA filed by Kristiana Kopchick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt)
March 17, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3644495. (Taylor, Jeffery)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kopchick v. Vision Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristiana Kopchick
Represented By: Jeffery A Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Bank NA
Represented By: Nathan L Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?