Strawn v. Stephens County et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Glen Strawn
Defendant: Stephens County, Kyle Keithley, Ron Williams, Cortnie Siess and Joe Lard
Case Number: 5:2021cv00247
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Order by Joseph Glen Strawn. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Order by Joseph Glen Strawn. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave by Joseph Glen Strawn. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Order by Joseph Glen Strawn. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Side Note, #2 Envelope)(knt)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Agency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 3/31/21. (lb)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff need not make an initial partial filing. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments until he has paid the full $350 filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 3/25/21. (lb)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. Entered by the direction of Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 03/23/2021. (knt)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases. (knt)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Glen Strawn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Resident Transaction Details, #2 Envelope)(knt)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kyle Keithley(in his official capacity, Duncan Police Department), Kyle Keithley(in his individual capacity), Joe Lard(in his individual capacity), Joe Lard(in his official capacity, Duncan Police Department), Cortnie Siess(in her official capacity, Asst D.A. Stephens County D.A.), Cortnie Siess(in her individual capacity), Stephens County, Ron Williams(in his official capacity, Stephens County indigent attorney), Ron Williams(in his individual capacity) filed by Joseph Glen Strawn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strawn v. Stephens County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Keithley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortnie Siess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Glen Strawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?