David v. LNU
Plaintiff: Jerome Adrian David
Defendant: FNU LNU
Case Number: 5:2021cv00261
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Shon T Erwin
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER terminating #6 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's filing operates as a dismissal of the lawsuit, with no order of the Court required or even authorized. Thus, Plaintiff's case was dismissed without prejudice on April 8, 2021 when his Motion was filed and the Clerk of Court is directed to close the file effective that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 4/20/2021. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Jerome Adrian David. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER -- In order for this action to proceed, Plaintiff must either pay the $402.00 filing fee or be granted leave to proceed without prepayment of fees. Additionally, Plaintiff's Complaint is not on the Court's approved form, accordingly, Plaintiff shall file a new, entirely complete Amended Complaint, including all the allegations that he wishes to raise. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated no later than April 19, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 4/1/2021. (mc)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed at the direction of The Honorable Scott L. Palk on 3/29/21. (dtb)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott L. Palk for all further proceedings. Honorable Stephen P. Friot no longer assigned to case.Signed at the direction of The Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 3/29/21. (dtb)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 PREVIOUS Cases (dtb)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU LNU filed by Jerome Adrian David. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Inmate Grievance, #2 Exhibit 2- Request to Staff, #3 Exhibit 3- Grievance Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 4- Grievance Restriction Warring, #5 Exhibit 5- Request to Staff, #6 Exhibit 6- Request to Staff, #7 Exhibit 7- Grievance Appeal to Administrative Review Authority, #8 Exhibit 8- Correspondence, #9 Exhibit 9- Grievance Decision, #10 Envelope) (dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David v. LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Adrian David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?