Mitchell v. Stephens County et al
Plaintiff: Rocky W Mitchell
Defendant: Jerry Herburger, Stephens County, Bobby Lewis, Michael Davidson, Jason Hicks and Bryan Sisco
Case Number: 5:2021cv00266
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Suzanne Mitchell
Referring Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Agency. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to the facility currently in custody of Plaintiff and shall not issue process until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 5/4/21. (lb)
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 Receipt for Money Received from Rocky W Mitchell in the amount of $10.00, receipt number OKW500085156 regarding #1 Complaint. Balance: $340.00. (kmt)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave by Rocky W Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Add Supplemental Claim and Defendant" by Rocky W Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Order by Rocky W Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $10.00 on or before 4/21/21. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments until he has paid the full $350.00 filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 3/31/21. (lb)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell.Entered by the direction of Honorable Scott L. Palk on 03/29/2021. (knt)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott L. Palk for all further proceedings. Honorable Jodi W. Dishman no longer assigned to case. Entered by the direction of Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 03/29/2021. (knt)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 PREVIOUS Cases (knt)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rocky W Mitchell (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rocky W Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Davidson(Lt. DPD, official capacity), Michael Davidson(individual capacity), Jerry Herburger(Judge, official capacity), Jerry Herburger(individual capacity), Jason Hicks(individual capacity), Jason Hicks(Stephens County D.A. Dist 6, official capacity), Bobby Lewis(individual capacity), Bobby Lewis(Assist. D.A, Stephens County Court Dist. 6, official capacity), Bryan Sisco(Officer Duncan Police Dept., official capacity), Bryan Sisco(individual capacity), Stephens County filed by Rocky W Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(knt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Stephens County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Herburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Sisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky W Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?