Stephenson v. Hoffman et al
Plaintiff: Deirdre L Stephenson
Defendant: Valley Proteins INC and Ladean G Hoffman
Case Number: 5:2021cv00279
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendants Ladean G Hoffman, Valley Proteins INC. (Newman, Rebecca)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2021 10:40 AM telephonically before Honorable Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 5/26/2021. (jb)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Valley Proteins INC . (Newman, Rebecca)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ladean G Hoffman, Valley Proteins INC. (Newman, Rebecca)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Custer County, case number CJ-2021-20 filed by Valley Proteins INC, Ladean G Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - EOA Special Reservation of Time, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendant's Answer, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)
March 31, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3653660. (Newman, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson v. Hoffman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Proteins INC
Represented By: Rebecca L Newman
Represented By: Dan S Folluo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladean G Hoffman
Represented By: Rebecca L Newman
Represented By: Dan S Folluo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deirdre L Stephenson
Represented By: Larry E Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?