Tucker v. Elk City Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Markeith D Tucker
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company, Elk City Police Department, Roberson Kolker Cooper Goeres PC, OMAG and Oklahoma Municipal Assurance Group
Case Number: 5:2021cv00311
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Markeith Tucker (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmt)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Markeith D Tucker (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Markeith Tucker (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmt)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 4/14/2021. (mc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Markeith D Tucker Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of The Honorable Scott L. Palk on 4/9/2021. (jjs)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Markeith D Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elk City Police Department, OMAG, Oklahoma Municipal Assurance Group, Progressive Insurance Company, Roberson Kolker Cooper Goeres PC filed by Markeith D Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter Dated 12/18/2020, #2 Attachment 2 - Letter Titled "ATTN Courts", #3 Attachment 3 - Letter Dated 03/25/2021, #4 Exhibit 1 - Letter Jayne Spies Claims Manager, #5 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Tort Claim, #6 Exhibit 3 - Letter Thomas J Prentice, #7 Exhibit 4 - Auto Insurance Coverage Summary, #8 Exhibit 5 - O'Reilly First Call, #9 Exhibit 6 - Elk City Police Department Incident Offense Report, #10 Exhibit 7 - Wikipedia Obstruction of Justice, #11 Exhibit 8 - Supplemental Assistance Program for Pro Se Litigants, #12 Exhibit 9 - Letter Rob Rowe, #13 Exhibit 10 - Past Medical History, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Envelope)(jjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Elk City Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elk City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberson Kolker Cooper Goeres PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMAG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oklahoma Municipal Assurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markeith D Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?