Aeronautical Title and Escrow Service LLC v. Generation Jets LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aeronautical Title and Escrow Service LLC
Defendant: Generation Jets LLC, Valerie Rubright, JetSky Inc and Jason Rubright
Case Number: 5:2021cv00355
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2021 09:45 AM via conference call before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 6/28/2021. (jw)
May 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE (other) by JetSky Inc re #2 Order,, (Ewing, Jonathan)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by John M Thompson on behalf of JetSky Inc (Thompson, John)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by JetSky Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Ewing, Jonathan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Henry D Hoss on behalf of Generation Jets LLC, Jason Rubright, Valerie Rubright (Hoss, Henry)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER On April 16, 2021, this action was removed to this Court by Defendant JetSky, Inc. (JetSky). It appears from the record that JetSky is represented by Jonathan A. Ewing, whose office is located in Ft. Lauderdale, Florida. As Mr. Ewing is apparently not a resident of, and does not maintain an office in, Oklahoma, he is required to comply with LCvR83.3(a), which requires association of non-resident counsel with local counsel, as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 4/20/21. (jw)
April 19, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BOKWDC-3666048. (Ewing, Jonathan)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-1031 filed by JetSky Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket as of 04-16-2021, #2 Exhibit 2 - Entry of Appearance, #3 Exhibit 3 - Petition for Interpleader, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Returned, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer to Petition for Interpleader, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aeronautical Title and Escrow Service LLC v. Generation Jets LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generation Jets LLC
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Rubright
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetSky Inc
Represented By: Jonathan A Ewing
Represented By: John M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rubright
Represented By: Henry D Hoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aeronautical Title and Escrow Service LLC
Represented By: Kyle D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?