Gregory et al v. Bishop et al
Plaintiff: Johnie Gregory and Sharon Brown
Defendant: Michael Bishop, GE Renewables Grid LLC, General Electric Company, GE Renewables Holding LLC, GE Renewables North America LLC, GE Renewables US LLC and GE REN Digital Services
Case Number: 5:2021cv00356
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Fields, Mark)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Date for Responsive Pleading. Defendants' Responsive pleadings are now due May 28, 2021. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 5/11/2021. (ks)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Chris J Collins on behalf of Michael Bishop, GE Renewables Grid LLC, GE Renewables Holding LLC, GE Renewables North America LLC, GE Renewables US LLC, General Electric Company (Collins, Chris)
May 11, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants response due 5/28/2021. (ks)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants Michael Bishop, GE Renewables US, LLC, GE Renewables Grid, LLC, General Electric Company, GE Renewables Holding, LLC and GE Renewables North America, LLC's Motion for Enlargement of Date for Responsive Pleading by Michael Bishop, GE Renewables Grid LLC, GE Renewables Holding LLC, GE Renewables North America LLC, GE Renewables US LLC, General Electric Company. (Miller, Jordan)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jordan Louis Miller on behalf of Michael Bishop, GE Renewables Grid LLC, GE Renewables Holding LLC, GE Renewables North America LLC, GE Renewables US LLC, General Electric Company (Miller, Jordan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 Receipt for Money Received from All Plaintiffs in the amount of $402, receipt number OKW500085083 regarding #1 Complaint (dtb)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (dtb)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sharon Brown, Johnie Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory et al v. Bishop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bishop
Represented By: Jordan Louis Miller
Represented By: Chris J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Renewables Grid LLC
Represented By: Jordan Louis Miller
Represented By: Chris J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jordan Louis Miller
Represented By: Chris J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Renewables Holding LLC
Represented By: Jordan Louis Miller
Represented By: Chris J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Renewables North America LLC
Represented By: Jordan Louis Miller
Represented By: Chris J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Renewables US LLC
Represented By: Jordan Louis Miller
Represented By: Chris J Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE REN Digital Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnie Gregory
Represented By: Mark E Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Brown
Represented By: Mark E Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?