Solano-Moreta v. Grant
Petitioner: Jorge Solano-Moreta
Respondent: SR Grant
Case Number: 5:2021cv00386
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Referring Judge: Shon T Erwin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 8 OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #5 filed by Jorge Solano-Moreta. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 JUDGMENT. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/26/2021. (mb)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #5 Report and Recommendation.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/26/2021. (mb) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/26/2021) (mb).
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- it is recommended that the Petition #1 be DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral by the District Judge in this matter. Objections to R&R due by 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/6/2021. (mc)
May 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 Receipt for Money Received from Jorge Solano-Moreta in the amount of $5.00, receipt number OKW500085178 regarding #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Receipt mailed to Jorge Solano-Moreta#11611-069EL RENO-FCIP O Box 1500El Reno, OK 73036 (dtb)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 4/22/2021. (kmt)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases (kmt)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jorge Solano-Moreta. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Letter, #2 Envelope)(kmt)
April 22, 2021 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 Petition, #3 Enter Order to: Jorge Solano-Moreta#11611-069EL RENO-FCIP O Box 1500El Reno, OK 73036 (kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solano-Moreta v. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Solano-Moreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SR Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?