Robinson v. Works & Lentz Inc
Plaintiff: Demarco Robinson
Defendant: Works & Lentz Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv00390
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Works & Lentz Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by Demarco Robinson.(Hill, Tiffany)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Works & Lentz Inc. (Ray, Ryan)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by W Caleb Jones on behalf of Works & Lentz Inc (Jones, W)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Works & Lentz Inc . (Ray, Ryan)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Ray on behalf of Works & Lentz Inc (Ray, Ryan)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demarco Robinson. All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hill, Tiffany)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Works & Lentz Inc. (kah)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Works & Lentz Inc filed by Demarco Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)
April 26, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3671296. (Hill, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Works & Lentz Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Works & Lentz Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Ray
Represented By: W Caleb Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demarco Robinson
Represented By: Tiffany L Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?