Thompson et al v. ADT LLC
Plaintiff: Myeisha Thompson
Defendant: ADT LLC doing business as Blue By ADT
Case Number: 5:2021cv00432
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 10/05/2021. (jb)
October 5, 2021 Filing 22 ENTER ORDER. The settlement conference was held on September 29, 2021, before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. The case did settle. Entered by direction of Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 10/5/21. (lb)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . ADT LLC answer due 10/13/2021. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 08/31/2021. (jb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by ADT LLC. (Pittman, Brock)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENTER ORDER. Settlement Conference RESET for 9/29/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Entered by direction of by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 8/19/21. (lb)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 8/18/21. (lb)
August 12, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason R Scott on behalf of ADT LLC (Scott, Jason)
August 10, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Charles C Eblen on behalf of ADT LLC (Eblen, Charles)
August 6, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler James Bean on behalf of Myeisha Thompson(on behalf of all similarly situated persons) (Bean, Tyler)
August 6, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by William B Federman on behalf of Myeisha Thompson(on behalf of all similarly situated persons) (Federman, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Scott shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before August 19, 2021, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 08/05/2021. (jb)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Eblen shall register to file documents electronically in this district, see LCvR 83.2(g), on or before August 19, 2021, and shall file an entry of appearance, see id. R. 83.4, by that same date on the form prescribed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 08/05/2021. (jb)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Settlement Conference. This matter is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell for a settlement conference pursuant to LCvR 16.2. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 08/05/2021. (jb)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall enter their appearances within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 08/05/2021. (jb)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION for Settlement Conference by Myeisha Thompson(on behalf of all similarly situated persons). (Federman, William)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3730597 by ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission)(Pittman, Brock)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3730585 by ADT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission)(Pittman, Brock)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by J Clay Christensen on behalf of ADT LLC (Christensen, J)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Brock Z Pittman on behalf of ADT LLC (Pittman, Brock)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan M Miles on behalf of ADT LLC (Miles, Jonathan)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defendant ADT LLC. ADT LLC waiver sent on 7/1/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (Federman, William)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to ADT LLC. (kah)
May 4, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3676945. (Federman, William)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADT LLC filed by Myeisha Thompson(individually), Myeisha Thompson(on behalf of all similarly situated persons). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Blue By ADT Permit Required, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. ADT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myeisha Thompson
Represented By: Tyler J Bean
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Tyler James Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC doing business as Blue By ADT
Represented By: Brock Z Pittman
Represented By: Charles C Eblen
Represented By: J Clay Christensen
Represented By: Jason R Scott
Represented By: Jonathan M Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?