Miller v. Woodward Police Department
Plaintiff: Micheal S Miller
Defendant: Woodward Police Department
Case Number: 5:2021cv00462
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Stephen P Friot
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is recommended Plaintiff's action Doc #1 re Complaint be dismissed without prejudice based on his failure to pay the required filing fee or request to proceed in forma pauperis and/or comply with the Court's Orders. Objections to R&R due by 7/19/2021. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 6/29/2021. (cps)
June 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/22/2021. In response, Plaintiff may pay the filing fee or submit a completed Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with required documentation, and file his Complaint on the court-approved form. Failure to fully comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 6/8/2021. (cps)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY. ACCORDINGLY, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by the 31st day of May, 2021. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to the Plaintiff along with this Order copies of the court-approved in forma pauperis form and 42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint form. Otherwise, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 5/11/2021. (cps)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Signed at the direction of The Honorable Stephen P. Friot on 5/10/2021. (dtb)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 PREVIOUS Cases (dtb)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Woodward Police Department filed by Micheal S Miller. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dtb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Woodward Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodward Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal S Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?