Owen et al v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Hunter Owen, SXS USA LLC and Laser Wolf FX Inc
Defendant: Nick Brown and DroneBois LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00481
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 19 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 60 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 06/03/2021. (lam)
June 2, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiffs and Defendants by Laser Wolf FX Inc, Hunter Owen, SXS USA LLC (Watson, Tynia)
May 25, 2021 Filing 17 ENTER ORDER the parties' joint motion for continuance #16 is granted...the 05/26/2021 hearing is CONTINUED to 06/03/2021 @ 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 501. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 05/25/2021. (lam)
May 25, 2021 Filing 16 FIRST MOTION to Continue by All Defendants. (Redwine, Robert)
May 25, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph C Schubert on behalf of All Defendants (Schubert, Joseph)
May 25, 2021 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert R Redwine on behalf of All Defendants (Redwine, Robert)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 plaintiffs' motion insofar as it seeks a TRO...plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is set for hearing on 05/26/2021 @ 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 501...see order for further specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 05/18/2021. (lam)
May 18, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Joe Heaton...hearing held on plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order filed 05/12/2021 #4 ; counsel for plaintiffs present; court hears arguments from counsel, witness testimony and exhibits offered; the court concludes that plaintiffs' motion is granted in part and sets plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction for hearing on 05/26/2021 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 501; written order to follow. (Court Reporter Susan Fenimore.) (lam) (lam)
May 18, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Joe Heaton...hearing held on plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order filed 05/12/2021 #4 ; counsel for plaintiffs present; court hears arguments from counsel, witness testimony and exhibits offered; the court concludes that plaintiffs' motion is granted in part and sets plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injuction for hearing on 05/26/2021 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 501; written order to follow. (Court Reporter Susan Fenimore.) (lam)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Laser Wolf FX Inc (CORRECTED). (Watson, Tynia)
May 17, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by SXS USA LLC . (Watson, Tynia)
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Laser Wolf FX Inc . (Watson, Tynia)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Nick Brown by Hunter Owen. (Watson, Tynia)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Dronebois LLC by Hunter Owen. (Watson, Tynia)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Hearing on plaintiff's motion #4 for temporary restraining order and for preliminary injunction set for 05/18/2021 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 501 before Honorable Joe Heaton...see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 05/14/2021. (lam)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Alyssa M Gillette on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gillette, Alyssa)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Laser Wolf FX Inc, Hunter Owen, SXS USA LLC. (Watson, Tynia)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Tynia A Watson on behalf of Laser Wolf FX Inc, Hunter Owen, SXS USA LLC (Watson, Tynia)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Nick Brown, DroneBois LLC. (jjs)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nick Brown, DroneBois LLC filed by Hunter Owen, Laser Wolf FX Inc, SXS USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjs)
May 12, 2021 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3682615. (Watson, Tynia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owen et al v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Owen
Represented By: Tynia A Watson
Represented By: Alyssa M Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SXS USA LLC
Represented By: Tynia A Watson
Represented By: Alyssa M Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laser Wolf FX Inc
Represented By: Tynia A Watson
Represented By: Alyssa M Gillette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Brown
Represented By: Joseph C Schubert
Represented By: Robert R Redwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DroneBois LLC
Represented By: Joseph C Schubert
Represented By: Robert R Redwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?