Duffy v. Southwest Medical Center Foundation et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Duffy
Defendant: Southwest Medical Center Foundation, General Surgery Care Center, Southwest Professional Physicians, Nchang M Azefor, Brendan F Essary, Andrey A Ilyasov and Imudia Ehanire
Case Number: 5:2021cv00540
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Scott L Palk
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kathryn Duffy (King, Bryan)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Dane H Miller on behalf of Kathryn Duffy (Miller, Dane)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan N B King on behalf of Kathryn Duffy (King, Bryan)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Southwest Medical Center Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Demand Letter)(Woodard, John)
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Southwest Medical Center Foundation. (Woodard, John)
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE (other) by General Surgery Care Center, Southwest Medical Center Foundation, Southwest Professional Physicians re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Woodard, John)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew B Morsman on behalf of General Surgery Care Center, Southwest Medical Center Foundation, Southwest Professional Physicians (Morsman, Andrew)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by John R Woodard, III on behalf of General Surgery Care Center, Southwest Medical Center Foundation, Southwest Professional Physicians (Woodard, John)
May 28, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Andrey A Ilyasov.(Walters, Hilton)
May 28, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Hilton H Walters on behalf of Andrey A Ilyasov (Walters, Hilton)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 Receipt for Money Received from Andrey A Ilyasov in the amount of $402.00, receipt number OKW500085657 regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, (kmt)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Texas County, case number CJ-2020-41 filed by Andrey A Ilyasov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email accepting service, #4 Exhibit 4 - GSCC Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 - Ehanire Summons, #6 Exhibit 6 - Essary Summons, #7 Exhibit 7 - Azefor Summons, #8 Exhibit 8 - SMCF Summons, #9 Exhibit 9 - SPF Summons, #10 Exhibit 10 - Ilyasov Summons, #11 Exhibit 11 - EOA Plaintiff, #12 Exhibit 12 - Motion to Enlarge Time, #13 Exhibit 13 - Order Granting Motion to Enlarge Time, #14 Exhibit 14 - Return of Service of Summons, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy v. Southwest Medical Center Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Medical Center Foundation
Represented By: Andrew B Morsman
Represented By: John R Woodard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Surgery Care Center
Represented By: Andrew B Morsman
Represented By: John R Woodard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Professional Physicians
Represented By: Andrew B Morsman
Represented By: John R Woodard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nchang M Azefor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan F Essary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrey A Ilyasov
Represented By: Hilton H Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imudia Ehanire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Duffy
Represented By: Dane H Miller
Represented By: Bryan N B King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?