Williams v. Hale
Defendant: T Hale and Mario Williams
Case Number: 5:2021cv00550
Filed: May 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 12 Receipt for Money Received from Mario Williams in the amount of $19.89, receipt number OKW500086443 regarding #1 Complaint, Balance Remaining $330.11. Mailed Receipt to Mario Williams #225143 SAYRE-NFCC 1605 E Main Sayre, OK 73662 (jjs)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Order titled "Motion to Object" by Mario Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Inmate Request, #2 Exhibit 2 - Department of Corrections Request for Disbursement, #3 Exhibit 3 - ODOC Check Detail, #4 Envelope)(knt)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is recommended Plaintiff's action Doc #1 re Complaint be dismissed without prejudice based on his failure to pay the initial partial filing fee and/or comply with the Court's Orders. Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2021. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 7/12/2021. (cps)
July 12, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENTER ORDER. Plaintiff is granted a brief extension to pay his initial partial filing fee of $19.89. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall pay the initial partial filing fee no later than July 6, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 5/25/2021. (cps)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Mario Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Transaction List, #2 Attachment 1 - Returned Mail, #3 Envelope)(jjs)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/9/2021.Accordingly, Plaintiff is directed to show cause through a written submission to the Court, no later than July 9th, 2021, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to either pay the initial partial filing fee and/or comply with this Court's Order. In response, Plaintiff may submit the initial partial filing fee. Failure to fully comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 6/22/2021. (cps)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE Titled "Request for Disbursement" by Mario Williams (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 5/28/2021. (cps)
May 28, 2021 Filing 4 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. Signed by the direction of Honorable Charles Goodwin on 05/28/2021. (jjs)
May 28, 2021 Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 Complaint, #2 Motion and #4 Enter Order to Mario Williams #225143 SAYRE-NFCC 1605 E Main Sayre, OK 73662 (jjs)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 PREVIOUS Cases (jjs)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mario Williams. (jjs)
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T Hale(In official capacity, CSO III), T Hale(individually) filed by Mario Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Certificate of Mailing, #2 Attachment 2 - Proff of Exhaustion (Administrative), #3 Exhibit 1 - Request to Staff, #4 Exhibit 2 - Grievance Dated 6/4/2020, #5 Exhibit 3 - Grievance Dated 7/6/2020, #6 Exhibit 4 - Grievance #20-21 Dated 4/26/2020, #7 Exhibit 5 - Grievance R/A Response Dated 7/29/2020, #8 Exhibit 6 - DOC Offense Report Dated 5/3/2020, #9 Exhibit 7 - Incident Staff Report Dated 5/03/2020, #10 Exhibit 8 - Witness Discretionary Action Record Dated 5/5/2020, #11 Exhibit 9 - Witness Discretionary Action Record 5/5/2020, #12 Exhibit 10 - Inmate Misconduct Appeal Form, #13 Envelope)(jjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?